EP2047036 - FLOOD DEFENCE WALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aqua Stop Hochwasserschutz GmbH Hofgründchen 55 56564 Neuwied / DE | [2009/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROOS, Jakob Hofgründchen 55 56564 Neuwied / DE | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB Amalienstrasse 62 80799 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard Partnerschaft Amalienstrasse 62 80799 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/16] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07801182.2 | 27.07.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007DE01341 | Priority number, date | DE20062011636U | 29.07.2006 Original published format: DE 202006011636 U | [2009/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008014765 | Date: | 07.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2047036 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E02B3/10, E02B3/16, E02B7/22 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
E02B3/106 (EP);
E02B7/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, LI [2009/36] |
Former [2009/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHWASSERSCHUTZWAND | [2009/16] | English: | FLOOD DEFENCE WALL | [2009/16] | French: | MUR DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES HAUTES EAUX | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 03.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/36] | 04.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2011 | 31.07.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE29920464U (HICKL HERBERT H [DE]; HELFFENSTEIN KURT [DE]) [X] 1-4,11-24,28-31 * page 3 - page 5; figure -; claim - *; | [X]DE3519168 (KOSSBIEL ERNST) [X] 1-17,30,31 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 41; figures 1,3,4 *; | [X]DE19807141 (NOELL STAHL UND MASCHINENBAU G [DE] DILLINGER STAHLBAU [DE]) [X] 1-13,30,31 * column 4, line 6 - column 5, line 8; figure - *; | [A]DE202004001196U (AQUA STOP HOCHWASSERSCHUTZ GMB [DE]) [A] 30 * figure 4 * |