EP2052432 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A LIQUID ELECTROLYTE BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IQ Power Licensing AG Baarerstrasse 137 6300 Zug / CH | [2009/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUER, C. Günther Oderweg 7 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [2009/18] | Representative(s) | Müller & Schubert Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 13 81667 München / DE | [2013/16] |
Former [2009/18] | Müller & Schubert Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 13 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07801244.0 | 16.08.2007 | [2009/18] | WO2007DE01453 | Priority number, date | DE20061038047 | 16.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006038047 | [2009/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008019676 | Date: | 21.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2052432 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2052432 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/38, H01M10/42, H01M10/12 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
H01M10/12 (EP,KR,US);
H01M6/005 (US);
H01M10/4214 (EP,US);
H01M50/70 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (US);
Y02P70/50 (US);
Y10T29/49108 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/18] | H01M10/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/18] | Extension states | AL | 06.03.2009 | BA | 06.03.2009 | HR | 06.03.2009 | MK | 06.03.2009 | RS | 06.03.2009 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FLÜSSIGELEKTROLYTBATTERIE | [2009/18] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A LIQUID ELECTROLYTE BATTERY | [2009/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE UNE BATTERIE À ÉLECTROLYTE LIQUIDE | [2009/18] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 31.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   20.02.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.04.2013 | DK | 17.04.2013 | EE | 17.04.2013 | FI | 17.04.2013 | LT | 17.04.2013 | LV | 17.04.2013 | MC | 17.04.2013 | MT | 17.04.2013 | NL | 17.04.2013 | SE | 17.04.2013 | SK | 17.04.2013 | GR | 18.07.2013 | GB | 16.08.2013 | IE | 16.08.2013 | LU | 16.08.2013 | IS | 17.08.2013 | PT | 19.08.2013 | BE | 31.08.2013 | CH | 31.08.2013 | LI | 31.08.2013 | FR | 02.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
MT | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
GB | 16.08.2013 | ||
IE | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
FR | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
GB | 16.08.2013 | ||
IE | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
FR | 02.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
GB | 16.08.2013 | ||
IE | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
IE | 16.08.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
BE | 31.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 17.04.2013 | |
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 17.04.2013 | |
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 17.04.2013 | |
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 17.04.2013 | |
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 17.04.2013 | |
PT | 19.08.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4221847 (INKMANN MARK S) [A] 1-3 * column 3, lines 15-33; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9515586 (TROJAN BATTERY CO [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 25; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9919923 (IQ BATTERY RES & DEV GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005058899 (RIVETTA CESARE [IT]) [A] 1-3* paragraphs [0023] - [0026]; figures 3-5 * |