EP2054270 - CAMERA SYSTEM, IN PARTICULAR FOR A SYSTEM FOR SENSING THE SURROUNDINGS OF A MOTOR VEHICLE, AND INSTALLATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Schalter und Sensoren GmbH Laiernstrasse 12 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2009/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CYWINSKI, Thorsten Riedstrasse 26 71691 Freiberg / DE | 02 /
ELMERING, Kai Amselweg 8 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | 03 /
BAUR, Alexander Am Vogelsang 30 86650 Wemding / DE | [2009/19] | Application number, filing date | 07801528.6 | 07.08.2007 | [2009/19] | WO2007EP06952 | Priority number, date | DE20061039654 | 24.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006039654 | [2009/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008022707 | Date: | 28.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2054270 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2054270 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60R11/04, H04N5/225 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
B60R11/04 (EP);
H04N25/134 (EP,US);
H04N23/51 (EP);
H04N23/54 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/19] | B60R11/04, B60R16/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2009/38] |
Former [2009/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KAMERASYSTEM, INSBESONDERE FÜR EIN UMFELDERFASSUNGSSYSTEM EINES FAHRZEUGS, UND MONTAGEVERFAHREN | [2009/19] | English: | CAMERA SYSTEM, IN PARTICULAR FOR A SYSTEM FOR SENSING THE SURROUNDINGS OF A MOTOR VEHICLE, AND INSTALLATION METHOD | [2009/19] | French: | SYSTEME DE CAMERA, NOTAMMENT POUR UN SYSTEME D'ACQUISITION DE L'ENVIRONNEMENT D'UN VEHICULE, ET PROCEDE DE MONTAGE | [2012/52] |
Former [2009/19] | SYSTÈME DE CAMÉRA, NOTAMMENT POUR UN SYSTÈME D'ACQUISITION DE L'ENVIRONNEMENT D'UN VÉHICULE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE MONTAGE | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 25.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2002006378 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [X] 1-11,13 * abstract *; | [X]JP2004055959 (KYOCERA CORP) [X] 1-11,13 * abstract *; | [A]DE102004009920 (VALEO SCHALTER & SENSOREN GMBH [DE])[A] 1 | Examination | US4295721 | US6507700 | US2004223074 | DE102004043236 | EP1670240 | EP1890479 | EP1905649 | by applicant | WO2005090127 |