EP2059416 - BUS COMMUNICATIONS MANAGEMENT IN A MOTOR VEHICLE WITH A PLURALITY OF CONTROL DEVICES CONNECTED VIA A BUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2012 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche AG Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/13] |
Former [2009/21] | For all designated states Dr. Ing. H.C.F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUZ, Dietmar Karl-Schneider-Strasse 6/2 75365 Calw / DE | 02 /
ROPPEL, Ruediger Ostpreussenstrasse 17 36103 Flieden / DE | [2009/21] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/43] | Application number, filing date | 07801869.4 | 24.08.2007 | [2009/21] | WO2007EP07441 | Priority number, date | DE20061040442 | 29.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006040442 | [2009/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008025487 | Date: | 06.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2059416 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2059416 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/03, G06F1/32 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
H04L12/4135 (EP,US);
H04L12/12 (EP,US);
H04L12/40039 (EP,US);
H04L12/462 (EP,US);
H04L2012/40215 (EP,US);
H04L2012/40273 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/40] |
Former [2009/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BUSKOMMUNIKATIONSMANAGEMENT BEI EINEM KRAFTFAHRZEUG MIT MEHREREN, ÜBER EINEN BUS VERBUNDENEN STEUERGERÄTEN | [2009/21] | English: | BUS COMMUNICATIONS MANAGEMENT IN A MOTOR VEHICLE WITH A PLURALITY OF CONTROL DEVICES CONNECTED VIA A BUS | [2009/21] | French: | GESTION DE COMMUNICATION PAR BUS SUR UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE COMPRENANT PLUSIEURS MODULES DE COMMANDE RELIES PAR UN BUS | [2009/21] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/21] | 14.05.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0435738 (JAEGER [FR]) [X] 1,6* column 6, line 45 - line 52; figures 1-6 *; | [X]EP1351433 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]FR2852755 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [X] 1,6 * page 2, line 5 - page 11, line 5; figures 1-12 * |