EP2059758 - FURNACE, IN PARTICULAR ARC FURNACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuchs Technology Holding AG Grabenhofstrasse 6 6010 Kriens / CH | [2011/15] |
Former [2009/21] | For all designated states Fuchs Technology AG Friedbergstrasse 68 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUCHS, Gerhard Eschigweg 1 77694 Kehl-Bodersweier / DE | [2009/21] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07801878.5 | 24.08.2007 | [2009/21] | WO2007EP07451 | Priority number, date | DE20061041421 | 04.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006041421 | [2009/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008028573 | Date: | 13.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2059758 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2059758 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/17] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2059758 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | [2012/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F27B3/12, F27B3/18, F27B3/10, F27D1/18, F27D3/00 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
F27B3/12 (EP,KR,US);
F27B3/085 (EP,US);
F27B3/10 (EP,US);
F27B3/18 (KR);
F27D1/18 (KR);
F27D1/1816 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHMELZOFEN, INSBESONDERE LICHTBOGENOFEN | [2009/21] | English: | FURNACE, IN PARTICULAR ARC FURNACE | [2009/21] | French: | FOUR DE FUSION ET EN PARTICULIER FOUR À ARC LUMINEUX | [2009/21] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/21] | 23.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11163495.2 / EP2362173 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.04.2011 | CZ | 27.04.2011 | DK | 27.04.2011 | EE | 27.04.2011 | FI | 27.04.2011 | HU | 27.04.2011 | IE | 27.04.2011 | LT | 27.04.2011 | LV | 27.04.2011 | MT | 27.04.2011 | NL | 27.04.2011 | PL | 27.04.2011 | SE | 27.04.2011 | SI | 27.04.2011 | SK | 27.04.2011 | BG | 27.07.2011 | GR | 28.07.2011 | ES | 07.08.2011 | LU | 24.08.2011 | IS | 27.08.2011 | PT | 29.08.2011 | BE | 31.08.2011 | CH | 31.08.2011 | FR | 31.08.2011 | LI | 31.08.2011 | MC | 31.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/29] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
LU | 24.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
FR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
LU | 24.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
FR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
FR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
CZ | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
IE | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
PL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 27.04.2011 | |
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 27.04.2011 | |
PT | 29.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A] - TRENKLER H, "ENERGY-SAVING DC TWIN SHELL ARC FURNACE FOR MELTING LOW-GRADE SCRAP", ABB REVIEW, ABB ASEA BROWN BOVERI, ZURICH, CH, (1996), no. 9/10, ISSN 1013-3119, pages 18 - 27, XP000681512 [A] 1 * figure 8 * * page 7 * | by applicant | - TRENKLER H, "ENERGY -SA VING DC TWIN SHELL ARC FURNA-CE FOR MELTING LOW-GRADE SCRAP", ABB REVIEW, ABB ASEA BROWN BOVERI, (1996), no. 9/10, pages 18 - 27 |