EP2057737 - PUSH-BUTTON SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diehl AKO Stiftung & Co. KG Pfannerstrasse 75 88239 Wangen / DE | [2009/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANGOLD, Harald Killinger-Strasse 15 73463 Lippach / DE | [2009/20] | Representative(s) | Diehl Patentabteilung c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstraße 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | Diehl Patentabteilung c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07801923.9 | 28.08.2007 | [2009/20] | WO2007EP07500 | Priority number, date | DE20061041226 | 02.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006041226 | [2009/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008028577 | Date: | 13.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2057737 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/96, H01L41/113, G06F3/041 | [2009/20] | CPC: |
H03K17/964 (EP,US);
D06F34/30 (EP,US);
H10N30/802 (EP,US);
H01H2201/02 (EP,US);
H03K2217/96015 (EP,US);
H10N30/302 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/20] | Title | German: | DRUCKTASTSCHALTER | [2009/20] | English: | PUSH-BUTTON SWITCH | [2009/20] | French: | BOUTON POUSSOIR | [2009/20] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 23.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/37] | 12.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19517141 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]); | [A]EP1338879 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]); | [A]WO2004023571 (TRIAD SENSORS INC [US], et al); | [X]DE102005006666 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) |