EP2056698 - CHILDREN'S HIGH CHAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Concord GmbH Industriestrasse 25 95346 Stadtsteinach / DE | [2014/15] |
Former [2009/20] | For all designated states Concord GmbH Industriestrasse 25 95346 Stadtsteinach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HESS, Andreas Goethestrasse 52 73525 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE | 02 /
REICHERT, Reiner Mühlstrasse 12 73527 Täferrot / DE | 03 /
SCHNABEL, Sebastian Sattelstrasse 60 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/20] | Representative(s) | Morgades y Manonelles, Juan Antonio Morgades & Del Rio, S.L. C/Rector Ubach, 37-39 bj. 2.o 08021 Barcelona / ES | [2014/12] |
Former [2009/20] | Köhler, Walter Louis,&Pöhlau,&Lohrentz Patentanwälte P.O. Box 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07802037.7 | 31.08.2007 | [2009/20] | WO2007EP07619 | Priority number, date | DE20061041249 | 02.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006041249 | [2009/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008028598 | Date: | 13.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2056698 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2056698 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A47D1/02 | [2009/20] | CPC: |
A47D1/023 (EP,US);
A47D1/002 (EP);
A47D1/004 (US);
A47D1/0085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2009/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KINDERHOCHSTUHL | [2009/20] | English: | CHILDREN'S HIGH CHAIR | [2009/20] | French: | CHAISE HAUTE POUR ENFANT | [2009/20] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 01.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR800552 (M. R. VIVIER) [X] 1-4 * page 2, column 1, line 10 - page 3, column 2, line 64; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US2580178 (KVARNSTROM ALFRED T) [X] 1 * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 14; figures 1-7 *; | [X]US2750989 (ROSS THOMAS D) [X] 1,2,9 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 39; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO03077712 (COSATTO HOLDINGS PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-4 * page 6, line 26 - page 14, line 11; figures 1-12 *; | [XP]WO2006130906 (FUNTASTIC LTD [AU], et al) [XP] 1,2,5-9 * page 7, line 9 - page 14, line 2; figures 1-22 *; | [XP]GB2428566 (ANGELS LANDING INC [US]) [XP] 1,2,5-8* paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0054]; figures 1-14 * | Examination | US6715827 | DE2930140 | JPS5410065 | US5524966 |