EP2066527 - VEHICLE SEAT WITH A ROTATABLE AND ESSENTIALLY DISPLACEABLE BACKREST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Controls GmbH Industriestrasse 20-30 51399 Burscheid / DE | [2009/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILDT, Helmut Holler Kreuz 1 51789 Lindlar/Schmitzhöhe-Holl / DE | 02 /
ABRAHAM, James Frankfurter Straße 214 51147 Köln / DE | [2009/31] |
Former [2009/24] | 01 /
MILDT, Helmut Holler Kreuz 1 51789 Lindlar/Schmitzhöhe-Holl / DE | ||
02 /
ABRAHAM, James Massiefen 11 51399 Burscheid / DE | Representative(s) | Schwöbel, Thilo K., et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | Schwöbel, Karl T., et al Patentanwälte Kutzenberger & Wolff Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 07802264.7 | 11.09.2007 | [2009/24] | WO2007EP07910 | Priority number, date | DE20061043205 | 11.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006043205 | [2009/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008031564 | Date: | 20.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2066527 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2066527 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/20, B60N2/36, B60N2/46 | [2011/46] | CPC: |
B60N2/36 (EP,US);
B60N2/20 (EP,US);
B60N2/757 (EP,US);
B60N2205/35 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/24] | B60N2/46, B60N2/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/24] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGSITZ MIT DREHBARER UND IM WESENTLICHEN VERLAGERBAREN RÜCKENLEHNE | [2009/24] | English: | VEHICLE SEAT WITH A ROTATABLE AND ESSENTIALLY DISPLACEABLE BACKREST | [2009/24] | French: | SIEGE DE VEHICULE A DOSSIER ROTATIF ET ESSENTIELLEMENT DECALABLE | [2009/24] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 10.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 06.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.09.2007 | CY | 22.02.2012 | DK | 22.02.2012 | EE | 22.02.2012 | FI | 22.02.2012 | IE | 22.02.2012 | IT | 22.02.2012 | LT | 22.02.2012 | LV | 22.02.2012 | MT | 22.02.2012 | NL | 22.02.2012 | RO | 22.02.2012 | SE | 22.02.2012 | SI | 22.02.2012 | TR | 22.02.2012 | BG | 22.05.2012 | GR | 23.05.2012 | ES | 02.06.2012 | IS | 22.06.2012 | PT | 22.06.2012 | AT | 11.09.2012 | GB | 11.09.2012 | LU | 11.09.2012 | BE | 30.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
MT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
TR | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
AT | 11.09.2012 | ||
GB | 11.09.2012 | ||
LU | 11.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
MT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
TR | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
AT | 11.09.2012 | ||
GB | 11.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
MT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
AT | 11.09.2012 | ||
GB | 11.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
MT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
GB | 11.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
GB | 11.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
IT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 22.02.2012 | |
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 22.02.2012 | |
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 22.02.2012 | |
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 22.02.2012 | |
NL | 22.02.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 22.02.2012 | |
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 22.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3540777 (BEAUMONT MARIO REVELLI DE) [X] 1 * column 1, lines 3-19 * * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 35 * * figures 2-4 * [Y] 3,6,8,9; | [A]EP0756961 (IKEDA BUSSAN CO [JP]) [A] 1,7 * abstract ** figure 1 *; | [XY]WO9728019 (ROVER GROUP [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,10,11 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 15 * * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 7 * * page 3, lines 18-20 * * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 19 * * page 7, line 25 - page 9, line 2 * * page 9, line 12 - page 10, line 16 * * figures 1-7 * [Y] 3,6,8,9; | [X]DE10345650 (FAURECIA AUTOSITZE GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,9-11 * paragraphs [0020] , [0025] * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE102004013271 (FAURECIA AUTOSITZE GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,9-11 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0006] - [0009] - [0016] , [0017] * * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US3666319 | WO9728019 |