EP2064116 - AERODYNAMIC BODY AND CARRIER WING COMPRISING AN AERODYNAMIC BODY FOR INFLUENCING POST-TURBULENCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/23] | AERODYNAMIC BODY AND CARRIER WING COMPRISING AN AERODYNAMIC BODY, ACTUATING DRIVE CONTROL MODULE, COMPUTER, COMPUTER PROGRAM, AND METHOD FOR INFLUENCING POST-TURBULENCES | ||
[2014/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | For all designated states Technische Universität München Arcisstrasse 21 80333 München / DE | [2014/30] |
Former [2011/27] | For all designated states Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | ||
For all designated states Technische Universität München Arcisstrasse 21 80333 München / DE | |||
Former [2009/23] | For all designated states Airbus Deutschland GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | ||
For all designated states Technische Universität München Arcisstrasse 21 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BREITSAMTER, Christian Ulrich-Nanshaimer-Strasse 60 85652 Landsham / DE | 02 /
ALLEN, Alexander Mercystrasse 75 85051 Ingolstadt / DE | [2009/24] |
Former [2009/23] | 01 /
BREITSAMTER, Christian Ulrich-Nanshaimer-Strasse 60 85652 Landsham / DE | ||
02 /
ALLEN, Alexander Freisinger Landstrasse 25 85748 Garching / DE | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2009/23] | Schatt, Markus F. Schatt IP Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Rindermarkt 7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07802322.3 | 15.09.2007 | [2009/23] | WO2007EP08038 | Priority number, date | DE20061043469 | 15.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006043469 | [2009/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008031620 | Date: | 20.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2064116 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2064116 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B64C23/06, B64C5/10, B64C13/16 | [2009/23] | CPC: |
B64C13/16 (EP,US);
B64C23/076 (EP,US);
Y02T50/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/23] | Title | German: | AERODYNAMISCHER KÖRPER SOWIE TRAGFLÜGEL MIT AERODYNAMISCHEM KÖRPER ZUR BEEINFLUSSUNG VON NACHLAUFWIRBELN | [2014/12] | English: | AERODYNAMIC BODY AND CARRIER WING COMPRISING AN AERODYNAMIC BODY FOR INFLUENCING POST-TURBULENCES | [2014/12] | French: | CORPS AÉRODYNAMIQUE ET AILE PORTANTE PRÉSENTANT UN CORPS AÉRODYNAMIQUE D'INFLUENCE DE POST-TURBULENCES | [2014/12] |
Former [2009/23] | AERODYNAMISCHER KÖRPER SOWIE TRAGFLÜGEL MIT AERODYNAMISCHEM KÖRPER, STELLANTRIEBS -ANSTEUERMODUL, COMPUTER, COMPUTERPROGRAMM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEEINFLUSSUNG VON NACHLAUF WIRBELN | ||
Former [2009/23] | AERODYNAMIC BODY AND CARRIER WING COMPRISING AN AERODYNAMIC BODY, ACTUATING DRIVE CONTROL MODULE, COMPUTER, COMPUTER PROGRAM, AND METHOD FOR INFLUENCING POST-TURBULENCES | ||
Former [2009/23] | CORPS AÉRODYNAMIQUE ET AILE PORTANTE PRÉSENTANT UN CORPS AÉRODYNAMIQUE, MODULE DE COMMANDE DE SERVOMOTEUR, ORDINATEUR, PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ D'INFLUENCE DE POST-TURBULENCES | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/23] | 14.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.09.2007 | CY | 23.07.2014 | CZ | 23.07.2014 | DK | 23.07.2014 | EE | 23.07.2014 | ES | 23.07.2014 | FI | 23.07.2014 | IT | 23.07.2014 | LT | 23.07.2014 | LV | 23.07.2014 | MC | 23.07.2014 | MT | 23.07.2014 | NL | 23.07.2014 | PL | 23.07.2014 | RO | 23.07.2014 | SE | 23.07.2014 | SI | 23.07.2014 | SK | 23.07.2014 | TR | 23.07.2014 | AT | 15.09.2014 | IE | 15.09.2014 | LU | 15.09.2014 | BE | 30.09.2014 | CH | 30.09.2014 | LI | 30.09.2014 | BG | 23.10.2014 | GR | 24.10.2014 | IS | 23.11.2014 | PT | 24.11.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 15.09.2007 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
AT | 15.09.2014 | ||
IE | 15.09.2014 | ||
LU | 15.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
AT | 15.09.2014 | ||
IE | 15.09.2014 | ||
LU | 15.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
AT | 15.09.2014 | ||
IE | 15.09.2014 | ||
LU | 15.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 15.09.2014 | ||
LU | 15.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
IE | 15.09.2014 | ||
LU | 15.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
LU | 15.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
LU | 15.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
LU | 15.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
LU | 15.09.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 23.07.2014 | |
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 23.07.2014 | |
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 23.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2846165 (AXELSON JOHN A) [A] 1 * column 4, line 18 - line 67; figure 2 *; | [A]GB850249 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 22,23,30,34* column 3, line 85 - line 89; figure 6 *; | [XA]US3174030 (NEWELL WILLIAM H, et al) [X] 23-25,28-31,34-37,40,41 * column 8, line 21 - column 9, line 22; figures 3,6,12,15 * [A] 26,27,38,39; | [XA]US3462662 (CARPENTER WARREN E) [X] 22,24,25,28-31,34-37,40,41 * column 5, line 3 - line 14 * * column 5, line 64 - line 74; figure 1 * [A] 26,27,38,39; | [X]US3561326 (CASSADAY ERNEST W) [X] 23-25,28-31,34-37,40,41 * column 2, line 34 - line 67; figure 1 *; | [A]DE2149956 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM) [A] 1 * page 5; figure 3 *; | [A]US4010409 (WAITES STEPHEN PETER) [A] 22,23,30,34 * column 4, line 30 - line 52; figure 2 *; | [X]US4197655 (MOORE NATHANIEL N [US]) [X] 23-25,28-31,34-37,40,41 * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 3; figure 2 *; | [DA]WO9900297 (BOEING CO [US]) [DA] 1 * abstract * * page 3, line 12 - line 28; figure 5 *; | [A]US5988563 (ALLEN JOHN B [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE20211664U (KAEHLER KAI [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US2846165 | US3462662 | DE2149956 | US5998563 | US6082679 | DE20211664U |