EP2061803 - PROCESS FOR THE PURIFICATION OF FC-CONTAINING PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2022 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ares Trading S.A. Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz 1170 Aubonne / CH | [2022/46] |
Former [2009/22] | For all designated states Ares Trading S.A. Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz 1170 Aubonne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EON-DUVAL, Alex Rue de l'Union 18 1800 Vevey / CH | 02 /
LAMPROYE, Alain Les Petites Bruyères 1699 Bouloz / CH | [2009/22] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [2022/46] |
Former [2019/33] | Merck Serono S.A. Intellectual Property Terre Bonne Business Park A2 Route de Crassier 15 1162 Eysins / CH | ||
Former [2009/22] | Merck Serono SA - Geneva Intellectual Property 9, chemin des Mines 1202 Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 07802925.3 | 27.08.2007 | [2009/22] | WO2007EP58887 | Priority number, date | EP20060119611 | 28.08.2006 Original published format: EP 06119611 | US20060842542P | 06.09.2006 Original published format: US 842542 P | [2009/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008025748 | Date: | 06.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2061803 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2061803 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2061803 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/18, C07K1/36, C07K16/06 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
C07K1/18 (EP,KR,US);
C07K1/22 (KR);
C07K1/36 (EP,US);
C07K16/065 (EP,US);
C07K16/18 (KR);
C07K19/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2015/41] | C07K1/18, C07K1/36, C07K16/00 | ||
Former IPC [2009/22] | C07K1/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/33] |
Former [2009/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 18.03.2009 | BA | 18.03.2009 | HR | 18.03.2009 | MK | 18.03.2009 | RS | 18.03.2009 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUFREINIGUNG VON FC-HALTIGEN PROTEINEN | [2009/22] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PURIFICATION OF FC-CONTAINING PROTEINS | [2009/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION DE PROTÉINES CONTENANT FC | [2009/22] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 15.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.05.2020
ADMISSIBLE Neuefeind, Regina Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE Opponent's representative Neuefeind, Regina Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | 02
14.05.2020
ADMISSIBLE Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Arabellastr. 30 81925 München / DE Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.05.2020
ADMISSIBLE Neuefeind, Regina Maiwald Patentanwalts - und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE Opponent's representative Neuefeind, Regina Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
02
14.05.2020
ADMISSIBLE Hoffman Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Arabellastr. 30 81925 München / DE Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | 17.06.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.10.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.11.2021 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.03.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.03.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 11.10.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.08.2019 | MC | 14.08.2019 | RO | 14.08.2019 | SI | 14.08.2019 | BG | 14.11.2019 | GR | 15.11.2019 | IS | 14.12.2019 | [2021/48] |
Former [2021/26] | CY | 14.08.2019 | |
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | MC | 14.08.2019 | |
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | MC | 14.08.2019 | |
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | RO | 14.08.2019 | |
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | RO | 14.08.2019 | |
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | BG | 14.11.2019 | |
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | BG | 14.11.2019 | Cited in | International search | [DY]WO9641624 (IMMUNEX CORP [US]) [DY] 1-25* page 13, line 32 - line 34; example 1 *; | [Y]WO2004076485 (LONZA BIOLOGICS PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 1-25 * page 3, line 9 - line 19 * * page 12, line 21 - line 22 *; | [Y]WO2005100394 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [Y] 1-25 * claim - *; | [Y]EP1614693 (KIRIN BREWERY [JP]) [Y] 1-25 * claim - * | Opposition | WO9964462 | US6417335 | WO03002713 | US2003229212 | WO2004024866 | WO9918130 | WO9957134 | WO02094852 | WO2009017491 | WO2008025748 | - P Parren, Et Al, "Changes to International Nonproprietary Names for antibody therapeutics 2017 and beyond: of mice, men and more", MABS, (20170101), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 898 - 906, XP055704031 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/19420862.2017.1341029 | - Goyon Alexandre; Excoffier Melissa; Janin-Bussat Marie-Claire; Bobaly Balazs; Fekete Szabolcs; Guillarme Davy; Beck Alain, "Determination of isoelectric points and relative charge variants of 23 therapeutic monoclonal antibodies", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B: BIOMEDICAL SCIENCES & APPLICATIONS., ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM., NL, NL, (20171015), vol. 1065, doi:10.1016/j.jchromb.2017.09.033, ISSN 1570-0232, pages 119 - 128, XP085233861 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jchromb.2017.09.033 | - A Williams, Frasca, V., "lon-Exchange Chromatography", Current Protocols in Protein Science, (19990101), pages 8.2.1 - 8.2.30, XP055704027 | - FAHRNER et al., "Industrial Purification of Pharmaceutical Antibodies: Development, Operation, and Validation of Chromatography Processes", Biotechnology and Genetic Engineering Reviews, (20010700), vol. 18, doi:10.1080/02648725.2001.10648017, pages 301 - 327, XP008034714 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/02648725.2001.10648017 | - P. W. Atkins, "Physical Chemistry. Third Edition. Passage", Oxford University Press, (19860101), page 666, XP055704023 | - "Ion Exchange Chromatography & Chromatofocusing - Principles and Methods", Amersham Biosciences, (20040000), pages 1 - 188 | - CHIODI et al., "Isoelectric focusing of monoclonal immunoglobulin G, A and M followed by detection with the avidin-biotin system", Electrophoresis, (19850000), vol. 6, doi:10.1002/elps.1150060305, pages 124 - 128, XP003022810 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/elps.1150060305 | - "Product Monograph of ORENCIA", Bristol -Myers Squibb Canada, (20190000), pages 1 - 73 | - C Jochheim, Et Al, "Separation of Enbrel® (rhuTNFR: Fc) Isoforms by Capillary Isoelectric Focusing", CE in Biotechnology: Practical Applications for Protein and Peptide Analyses, (20010101), vol. 53, pages s59 - s65, XP055739511 | - FENG LI et al, "Current therapeutic antibody production and process optimization", BIOPROCESSING: ADVANCES AND TRENDS IN BIOLOGICAL PRODUCTDEVELOPMENT, WILLIAMSBURG BIOPROCESSING FOUNDATION, US, US, (20050901), ISSN 1538-8786, pages 1 - 8, XP002519952 | - Mariana P. Miranda-Hernández et al, "Pharmacokinetic Comparability of a Biosimilar Trastuzumab Anticipated from Its Physicochemical and Biological Characterization", BioMed Research International, Hindawi Publishing Corporation, (20150101), vol. 2015, doi:10.1155/2015/874916, ISSN 2314-6133, pages 1 - 7, XP055366650 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2015/874916 | - WILLEN, "Identifizierung, Charakterisierung und funktionelle Analyse der Bindungspartner von APRIL und TACI auf Monozyten und Dendritischen Zellen", INAUGURAL-DISSERTATION zur Erlangung der Doktorwürde der Naturwissenschaftlich-Mathematischen-Gesamtfakultät der Ruprecht-Karls-Universität Heidelberg, Heidelberg, (20060500), pages 1 - 159 | - FAHRNER et al., "Industrial Purification of Pharmaceutical Antibodies: Development, Operation, and Validation of Chromatography Processes", Biotechnology and Genetic Engineering Reviews, (20010000), vol. 18, no. 1, doi:10.1080/02648725.2001.10648017, pages 301 - 327, XP008034714 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/02648725.2001.10648017 | - Electrical conductivity of aqueous solutions, URL: https://sites.chem.colostate.edu/diverdi/all- cou rses/CRC%20refe rence%20data/electrical%20cond uctivity%20of%20aq ueous%20 solutions.pdf | - CHIODI et al., "Isoelectric focusing of monoclonal immunoglobulin G, A and M followed by detection with the avidin-biotin system", Electrophoresis, (19850000), vol. 6, doi:10.1002/elps.1150060305, pages 124 - 128 | - C Jochheim, Et Al, "Separation of Enbrel® (rhuTNFR: Fc) Isoforms by Capillary Isoelectric Focusing", CE in Biotechnology: Practical Applications for Protein and Peptide Analyses, (20010101), vol. 53, pages s59 - s65 | - FENG LI et al, "Current therapeutic antibody production and process optimization", BIOPROCESSING: ADVANCES AND TRENDS IN BIOLOGICAL PRODUCTDEVELOPMENT, WILLIAMSBURG BIOPROCESSING FOUNDATION, US, US, (20050901), ISSN 1538-8786, pages 1 - 8 | - Mariana P. Miranda-Hernández et al, "Pharmacokinetic Comparability of a Biosimilar Trastuzumab Anticipated from Its Physicochemical and Biological Characterization", BioMed Research International, Hindawi Publishing Corporation, (20150101), vol. 2015, doi:10.1155/2015/874916, ISSN 2314-6133, pages 1 - 7 | - FAHRNER et al., "Industrial Purification of Pharmaceutical Antibodies: Development, Operation, and Validation of Chromatography Processes", Biotechnology and Genetic Engineering Reviews, (20010000), vol. 18, no. 1, doi:10.1080/02648725.2001.10648017, pages 301 - 327 | - P Parren, Et Al, "Changes to International Nonproprietary Names for antibody therapeutics 2017 and beyond: of mice, men and more", MABS, (20170101), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 898 - 906 | - Goyon Alexandre et al, "Determination of isoelectric points and relative charge variants of 23 therapeutic monoclonal antibodies", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B: BIOMEDICAL SCIENCES & APPLICATIONS., ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM., NL, (20171015), vol. 1065, doi:10.1016/j.jchromb.2017.09.033, ISSN 1570-0232, pages 119 - 128 | - A Williams, Frasca, V., "lon-Exchange Chromatography", Current Protocols in Protein Science, (19990101), pages 8.2.1 - 8.2.30 | - P. W. Atkins, "Physical Chemistry. Third Edition. Passage", Oxford University Press, (19860101), page 666 | - Ghosc ct al.. Biotechnology and Bioengineering. Vol. 92. No. 6. December 20. 2005 (published online on October 4.2005). DOI: 10 1002/bit.20729 |