EP2102049 - MOTOR VEHICLE BRAKING ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEYLERIAN, Bruno 3 bis rue des Carquais F-95380 Louvres / FR | 02 /
NEN, Yannick 3 allée Théodore Botrel F-91290 Arpajon / FR | 03 /
DURAND, Etienne 17 rue Niepce F-75014 Paris / FR | 04 /
MARLHE, Nicolas 10 Hameau du Gué F-95670 Marly La Ville / FR | 05 /
PIEL, Jean-Marc 18 bis avenue Turgot F-93190 Livry Gargan / FR | 06 /
HURWIC, Aleksander 5 rue des Couronnes F-75020 Paris / FR | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | Hurwic, Aleksander Wiktor Robert Bosch France (SAS) 126, rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Hurwic, Aleksander Wiktor Robert Bosch France (SAS) 126, rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | ||
Former [2009/39] | Hurwic, Aleksander Wiktor Robert Bosch France (SAS) 126, rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 07802937.8 | 28.08.2007 | [2009/39] | WO2007EP58902 | Priority number, date | FR20060007943 | 08.09.2006 Original published format: FR 0607943 | [2009/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008028840 | Date: | 13.03.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2102049 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2102049 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/48 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
B60T8/38 (EP,US);
B60T8/4291 (EP,US);
B60T8/4872 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Title | German: | KRAFTFAHRZEUGBREMSANORDNUNG | [2009/39] | English: | MOTOR VEHICLE BRAKING ASSEMBLY | [2009/39] | French: | INSTALLATION DE FREINAGE POUR VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2009/39] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 29.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.08.2007 | AT | 19.10.2011 | CY | 19.10.2011 | CZ | 19.10.2011 | DK | 19.10.2011 | EE | 19.10.2011 | FI | 19.10.2011 | IE | 19.10.2011 | LT | 19.10.2011 | LV | 19.10.2011 | MT | 19.10.2011 | NL | 19.10.2011 | PL | 19.10.2011 | RO | 19.10.2011 | SE | 19.10.2011 | SI | 19.10.2011 | SK | 19.10.2011 | TR | 19.10.2011 | BG | 19.01.2012 | GR | 20.01.2012 | IS | 19.02.2012 | PT | 20.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
MT | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
TR | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
MT | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 19.10.2011 | |
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 19.10.2011 | |
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 19.10.2011 | |
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 19.10.2011 | |
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 19.10.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS61160343 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 4-6 * abstract *; | [A]FR2645816 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1-3,7,9 * abstract *; | [A]DE4014052 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1* column 3, line 34 - column 5, line 9; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0641697 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [A] 1-5,8 * column 1, line 4 - line 52; figure 1 * | by applicant | FR2645816 | EP0641697 |