EP2064082 - VALVE FOR THE VENTING CIRCUIT OF A LIQUID TANK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inergy Automotive Systems Research (Société Anonyme) Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [2009/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARNALSTEEN, Michel Kortemansstraat 102 B-1702 Groot-Bijgaarden / BE | 02 /
CUVELIER, Vincent Avenue Verhaeren 16 B-1030 Bruxelles / BE | 03 /
ROUXEL, Thierry 16, rue des Tilleuls F-53210 Argentre / FR | [2009/23] | Representative(s) | Jacques, Philippe, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Jacques, Philippe, et al Solvay S.A. Département de la Propriété Industrielle, Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 07803184.6 | 04.09.2007 | [2009/23] | WO2007EP59199 | Priority number, date | FR20060007722 | 04.09.2006 Original published format: FR 0607722 | [2009/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008028894 | Date: | 13.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2064082 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2064082 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60K15/035, F16K24/04 | [2009/23] | CPC: |
B60K15/03519 (EP);
F16K24/04 (KR);
B60K15/035 (KR);
F16K24/044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/23] | Title | German: | VENTIL FÜR DIE BELÜFTUNGSSCHALTUNG EINES FLÜSSIGKEITSTANKS | [2009/23] | English: | VALVE FOR THE VENTING CIRCUIT OF A LIQUID TANK | [2009/23] | French: | SOUPAPE POUR CIRCUIT DE MISE À L'AIR LIBRE D'UN RESERVOIR DE LIQUIDE | [2009/23] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/23] | 10.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.12.2010 | BE | 15.12.2010 | CY | 15.12.2010 | CZ | 15.12.2010 | DK | 15.12.2010 | EE | 15.12.2010 | FI | 15.12.2010 | HU | 15.12.2010 | IT | 15.12.2010 | LT | 15.12.2010 | LV | 15.12.2010 | MT | 15.12.2010 | NL | 15.12.2010 | PL | 15.12.2010 | RO | 15.12.2010 | SE | 15.12.2010 | SI | 15.12.2010 | SK | 15.12.2010 | TR | 15.12.2010 | BG | 15.03.2011 | GR | 16.03.2011 | ES | 26.03.2011 | IS | 15.04.2011 | PT | 15.04.2011 | GB | 04.09.2011 | IE | 04.09.2011 | LU | 04.09.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
MT | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
TR | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
GB | 04.09.2011 | ||
IE | 04.09.2011 | ||
LU | 04.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
MT | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
GB | 04.09.2011 | ||
IE | 04.09.2011 | ||
LU | 04.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
MT | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
GB | 04.09.2011 | ||
IE | 04.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/36] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
GB | 04.09.2011 | ||
IE | 04.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
IE | 04.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
PL | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
BE | 15.12.2010 | ||
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 15.12.2010 | |
CY | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
NL | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5234013 (ROETKER JOHN J [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 7, line 44 - line 50 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5566705 (HARRIS ROBERT S [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 9, line 1 - line 8 * * column 10, line 66 - column 11, line 5 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5960816 (MILLS VAUGHN [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US2004238033 (MIYOSHI KEIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* abstract * |