EP2028929 - EAR TAG FOR IDENTIFYING AN ANIMAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A. Raymond et Cie. 115, Cours Berriat B.P. 157 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2009/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUBTANE, Mohieddine 16, avenue de la République F-38170 Seyssinet-Pariset / FR | 02 /
LEGAT, Jean-Jacques 91, chemin de Tessy F-38690 Colombe / FR | 03 /
GONDRE, Marc La Mantaudière F-38270 Bellegarde Poussieu / FR | 04 /
GIRARD, Didier 75 Ter Rue Chazières F-69004 Lyon / FR | [2009/10] | Representative(s) | Hecké, Gérard, et al Cabinet Hecké 10, rue d'Arménie - Europole BP 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | Hecké, Gérard, et al Cabinet Hecké World Trade Center - Europole 5, Place Robert Schuman BP 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07803760.3 | 20.06.2007 | [2009/10] | WO2007FR01022 | Priority number, date | FR20060005489 | 20.06.2006 Original published format: FR 0605489 | [2009/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007147972 | Date: | 27.12.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2028929 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2028929 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A01K11/00 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
A01K11/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR [2009/29] |
Former [2009/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OHRMARKE ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINES TIERES | [2009/10] | English: | EAR TAG FOR IDENTIFYING AN ANIMAL | [2009/10] | French: | ETIQUETTE AURICULAIRE D'IDENTIFICATION POUR ANIMAL | [2009/10] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 21.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9006570 (IDENTIFICATION TECHNOLOGY CORP [US]) [A] 1-3 * page 4, line 14 - page 6, line 23; figure - *; | [A]FR2380725 (YVORRA GEORGES [FR]) [A] 1-3 * page 2, line 17 - page 3; figure - *; | [A]US2003121188 (HAAR KARY [US] ET AL) [A] 1 * paragraph [0034]; figure - *; | [A]US6095915 (GEISSLER RANDOLPH K [US] ET AL) [A] 1 * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 31; figure - * |