EP2057687 - BARE MICROELECTRONIC CHIP PROVIDED WITH A RECESS FORMING A HOUSING FOR A WIRE ELEMENT CONSTITUTING A FLEXIBLE MECHANICAL SUPPORT, FABRICATION PROCESS AND MICROSTRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, BG, CY, HU | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2015/17] |
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/20] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique 25, rue Leblanc Immeuble "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VICARD, Dominique 180, chemin Emile Gandy 38330 Saint Nazaire les Eymes / FR | 02 /
MOUREY, Bruno 6, rue des Peupliers 38500 Coublevie / FR | 03 /
BRUN, Jean 13, domaine de Rochagnon 38800 Champagnier / FR | [2009/20] | Representative(s) | Hecké, Gérard, et al Cabinet Hecké 10, rue d'Arménie - Europole BP 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/17] | Hecké, Gérard, et al Cabinet Hecké 10 rue d'Arménie - Europole BP 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | ||
Former [2009/52] | Hecké, Gérard, et al Cabinet Hecké 10, rue d'Arménie Europole BP 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | ||
Former [2009/20] | Jouvray, Marie-Andrée, et al Cabinet HECKE 10 rue d'Arménie - Europole BP 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07803768.6 | 21.06.2007 | [2009/20] | WO2007FR01034 | Priority number, date | FR20060007588 | 29.08.2006 Original published format: FR 0607588 | [2009/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008025889 | Date: | 06.03.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2057687 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2057687 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077, H01L29/06, H01L25/065, H01L21/98, A41D1/00, H01L23/48, G06K19/02, H01Q1/22, H01Q7/00, H01L23/58, H01L23/49 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
H01L25/0657 (EP,US);
G06K19/027 (EP,US);
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
G06K19/0775 (EP,US);
H01L23/481 (EP,US);
H01L23/58 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L25/0652 (EP,US);
H01L25/0655 (EP,US);
H01L25/50 (EP,US);
H01Q1/2208 (EP,US);
H01Q7/00 (EP,US);
H01L2223/6677 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45015 (EP,US);
H01L2224/451 (EP,US);
H01L2224/4569 (EP);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/4847 (EP,US);
H01L2225/06527 (EP,US);
H01L2225/06551 (EP,US);
H01L2225/06555 (EP,US);
H01L23/66 (EP,US);
H01L24/45 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01023 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01058 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01074 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12041 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49165 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/451, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/451, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/85399 (EP); |
Former IPC [2009/20] | H01L29/06, H01L25/065, H01L21/98, A41D1/00, H01L23/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/17] |
Former [2009/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNGEHÄUSTER MIKROELEKTRONISCHER CHIP, DER MIT EINER AUSHÖHLUNG AUSGESTATTET IST, DIE EIN GEHÄUSE FÜR EIN DRAHTELEMENT BILDET, DAS EINE FLEXIBLE MECHANISCHE STRUKTUR DARSTELLT, HERSTELLUNGSPROZESS UND MIKROSTRUKTUR | [2014/44] | English: | BARE MICROELECTRONIC CHIP PROVIDED WITH A RECESS FORMING A HOUSING FOR A WIRE ELEMENT CONSTITUTING A FLEXIBLE MECHANICAL SUPPORT, FABRICATION PROCESS AND MICROSTRUCTURE | [2009/20] | French: | PUCE MICROELECTRONIQUE NUE MUNIE D'UNE RAINURE FORMANT UN LOGEMENT POUR UN ELEMENT FILAIRE CONSTITUANT UN SUPPORT MECANIQUE SOUPLE, PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET MICROSTRUCTURE | [2014/44] |
Former [2009/20] | MIKROELEKTRONISCHER ROHCHIP, DER MIT EINER AUSHÖHLUNG AUSGESTATTET IST, DIE EIN GEHÄUSE FÜR EIN DRAHTELEMENT BILDET, DAS EINE FLEXIBLE MECHANISCHE STRUKTUR DARSTELLT, HERSTELLUNGSPROZESS UND MIKROSTRUKTUR | ||
Former [2009/20] | PUCE MICROELECTRONIQUE NUE MUNIE D'UN EVIDEMENT FORMANT UN LOGEMENT POUR UN ELEMENT FILAIRE CONSTITUANT UN SUPPORT MECANIQUE SOUPLE, PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET MICROSTRUCTURE | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 19.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 24.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.06.2007 | AT | 22.04.2015 | BG | 22.04.2015 | CY | 22.04.2015 | CZ | 22.04.2015 | DK | 22.04.2015 | EE | 22.04.2015 | FI | 22.04.2015 | LT | 22.04.2015 | LV | 22.04.2015 | MC | 22.04.2015 | MT | 22.04.2015 | PL | 22.04.2015 | RO | 22.04.2015 | SI | 22.04.2015 | SK | 22.04.2015 | IE | 21.06.2015 | LU | 21.06.2015 | BE | 30.06.2015 | GR | 23.07.2015 | IS | 22.08.2015 | PT | 24.08.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
MT | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
IE | 21.06.2015 | ||
LU | 21.06.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
IE | 21.06.2015 | ||
LU | 21.06.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
IE | 21.06.2015 | ||
LU | 21.06.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
IE | 21.06.2015 | ||
IT | 21.06.2015 | ||
LU | 21.06.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 21.06.2015 | ||
LU | 21.06.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 21.06.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 21.06.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 22.04.2015 | |
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 22.04.2015 | |
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6646336 (MARMAROPOULOS GEORGE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,11 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2003163313 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS JAPAN) [A] 1,3,4 * abstract *; | [A]US2006175697 (KUROSAWA TETSUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,4,6,8 * paragraphs [0168] - [0173]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]JP2003086762 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 8,16 * abstract *; | [A]US2003211797 (HILL IAN GREGORY [US], et al) [A] 1,3,4,6,7,12 * paragraphs [0002] - [0008] - [0067] - [0075]; figures 1A,1B,4A-4D,5 *; | [A]US2003082851 (VAN HOFF JAY F [US]) [A] 1,5,6,11 * paragraphs [0042] - [0061]; figures 18,19 *; | [A]US2005277307 (ZOLLO JAMES A [US], et al) [A] 1,5,11 * the whole document * | Examination | US2005223552 |