EP2046767 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING DIAMINOPHENOTHIAZINIUM COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Provence Technologies Les Baronnies 22 rue Marc Donadille 13013 Marseille / FR | [2015/13] |
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states Provence Technologies Hôtel Technologique Technopôle de Château-Gombert 13382 Marseille Cedex 13 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERAUD, Michel 14 chemin de Rousset Castéou-Gombert F-13013 Marseille / FR | 02 /
SAYAH, Babak 3 boulevard Francine F-13013 Marseille / FR | [2015/17] |
Former [2009/16] | 01 /
FERAUD, Michel 14 chemin de Rousset Castéou-Gombert F-13013 Marseille / FR | ||
02 /
SAYAH, Babak 3 boulevard Francine F-13013 Marseille / FR | Representative(s) | Corizzi, Valérie INNOVATION COMPETENCE GROUP PACT- IP 310 bis avenue Berthelot 69008 Lyon / FR | [2014/21] |
Former [2014/17] | Corizzi, Valérie Innovation Competence Group 310 avenue Berthelot 69008 Lyon / FR | ||
Former [2014/14] | Hirsch & Associés 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2011/34] | Vieillefosse, Jean-Claude Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/49] | Corizzi, Valérie Cabinet Harlé et Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/16] | Corizzi, Valérie, et al Cabinet ORES, 36, rue de Saint Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07803863.5 | 12.07.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007FR01193 | Priority number, date | FR20060006330 | 12.07.2006 Original published format: FR 0606330 | [2009/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008006979 | Date: | 17.01.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2046767 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2046767 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D279/20, C07D279/22, A61K31/5415, A61P31/00, A61P25/00, A61P7/00 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
C07D279/20 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/5415 (KR);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
C07D279/22 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/17] |
Former [2009/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DIAMINOPHENOTHIAZINIUMVERBINDUNGEN | [2009/16] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING DIAMINOPHENOTHIAZINIUM COMPOUNDS | [2009/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE COMPOSÉS DIAMINOPHENOTHIAZINIUM. | [2014/52] |
Former [2009/16] | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE COMPOSES DIAMINOPHENOTHIAZINIUM. | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 22.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.11.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 25.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP11191740.7 / EP2431359 | EP15159302.7 / EP2913327 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 01/exclusive | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Licencee: | Provepharm Hôtel Technologique Technopole de Château-Gombert 13382 Marseille Cedex 13 / FR | Date: | 19.08.2011 | [2011/46] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.04.2015 | EE | 22.04.2015 | LT | 22.04.2015 | LV | 22.04.2015 | MC | 22.04.2015 | IS | 22.08.2015 | [2017/40] |
Former [2016/13] | EE | 22.04.2015 | |
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 22.04.2015 | |
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | LT | 22.04.2015 | |
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | LT | 22.04.2015 | |
LV | 22.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2810318 (GALEY LAURENT [FR]); | [X]WO2005054217 (PHOTOPHARMICA LTD [GB], et al); | [AX]WO2006032879 (TAURX THERAPEUTICS PTE LTD [SG], et al); | Examination | US4003892 | EP2057136 |