EP2032437 - METHOD FOR PLACING IN OPERATIONAL ORBIT AN ARTIFICIAL SATELLITE AND ASSOCIATED PROPULSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASTRIUM SAS 6, rue Laurent Pichat 75016 Paris / FR | [2009/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GENESTE, Jean-François 1, impasse Calvinet 31500 Toulouse / FR | 02 /
POUSSIN, Jean-François 1, rue Léon Viala 31520 Ramonville / FR | [2009/11] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/11] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07803938.5 | 26.06.2007 | [2009/11] | WO2007FR51516 | Priority number, date | FR20060005794 | 27.06.2006 Original published format: FR 0605794 | [2009/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008001002 | Date: | 03.01.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2032437 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2032437 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B64G1/00, B64G1/24, B64G1/64, B64G1/40 | [2009/11] | CPC: |
B64G1/2427 (EP,US);
B64G1/242 (US);
B64G1/641 (EP,US);
B64G1/002 (EP,US);
B64G1/401 (EP,US);
B64G1/402 (US);
B64G1/4021 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PLATZIERUNG EINES KÜNSTLICHEN SATELLITEN IM OPERATIONELLEN ORBIT UND ENTSPRECHENDE ANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG | [2009/11] | English: | METHOD FOR PLACING IN OPERATIONAL ORBIT AN ARTIFICIAL SATELLITE AND ASSOCIATED PROPULSION DEVICE | [2009/11] | French: | PROCEDE DE MISE EN ORBITE OPERATIONNELLE D'UN SATELLITE ARTIFICIEL ET DISPOSITIF DE PROPULSION ASSOCIE | [2009/11] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 03.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.03.2010 | CY | 31.03.2010 | CZ | 31.03.2010 | DK | 31.03.2010 | EE | 31.03.2010 | FI | 31.03.2010 | GR | 31.03.2010 | IE | 31.03.2010 | LT | 31.03.2010 | LV | 31.03.2010 | MT | 31.03.2010 | PL | 31.03.2010 | RO | 31.03.2010 | SE | 31.03.2010 | SI | 31.03.2010 | SK | 31.03.2010 | TR | 31.03.2010 | LU | 26.06.2010 | BE | 30.06.2010 | BG | 30.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | IS | 31.07.2010 | PT | 02.08.2010 | HU | 01.10.2010 | [2014/38] |
Former [2013/42] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
LU | 26.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
LU | 26.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
LU | 26.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/27] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 26.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 26.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4471926 (STEEL III ROBERT W [US]); | [A]DE19623017 (DAIMLER BENZ AEROSPACE AG [DE]); | [AD]WO9914118 (AEROSPATIALE [FR], et al); | [A]EP0947424 (TRW INC [US]); | [A]US6113032 (COCHRAN DAVID B [US], et al); | [A]US2002179776 (MUELLER GEORGE E [US], et al); | [A]WO2005118394 (INTERSECURE LOGIC LTD [CY], et al) |