EP2059431 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CHECKING THAT A SENSOR THAT DETECTS A CHANGE IN STATE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE DRIVER'S DOOR IS OPERATING CORRECTLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault S.A.S. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2010/33] |
Former [2009/21] | For all designated states Renault S.A.S. 13-15 Quai Alfonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEBRER, Pascal 9, rue Boulard 75014 Paris / FR | 02 /
HEDOUIN, Gael 54, rue Rouget de Lisle 92800 Puteaux / FR | [2009/21] | Application number, filing date | 07803949.2 | 26.06.2007 | [2009/21] | WO2007FR51533 | Priority number, date | FR20060007726 | 04.09.2006 Original published format: FR 0607726 | [2009/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008029035 | Date: | 13.03.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2059431 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2059431 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60W50/02 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
B60T7/085 (EP);
B60W2050/0215 (EP);
B60W2510/186 (EP);
B60W30/18054 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERPÜFUNG DER KORREKTEN FUNKTIONSWEISE EINES SENSORS ZUR ERKENNUNG VON ÄNDERUNGEN DES ZUSTANDS EINER FAHRERTÜR EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGES | [2009/21] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CHECKING THAT A SENSOR THAT DETECTS A CHANGE IN STATE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE DRIVER'S DOOR IS OPERATING CORRECTLY | [2009/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE CONTROLE DU BON FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN CAPTEUR DE DETECTION D'UN CHANGEMENT D'ETAT D'UNE PORTE DE CONDUCTEUR POUR VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2009/21] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/21] | 21.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.08.2010 | CY | 18.08.2010 | CZ | 18.08.2010 | DK | 18.08.2010 | EE | 18.08.2010 | FI | 18.08.2010 | HU | 18.08.2010 | IE | 18.08.2010 | IT | 18.08.2010 | LT | 18.08.2010 | LV | 18.08.2010 | MT | 18.08.2010 | NL | 18.08.2010 | PL | 18.08.2010 | RO | 18.08.2010 | SE | 18.08.2010 | SI | 18.08.2010 | SK | 18.08.2010 | TR | 18.08.2010 | BG | 18.11.2010 | GR | 19.11.2010 | ES | 29.11.2010 | IS | 18.12.2010 | PT | 20.12.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
IE | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
TR | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
IE | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
IE | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
ES | 29.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
IE | 18.08.2010 | ||
IT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
NL | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5632706 (KREMMLING BURKARD [DE], et al) [A] 1,5* the whole document *; | [A]WO0114195 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE], et al) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [A]US6450587 (MACGREGOR G DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004089491 (REUTER DAVID C [US]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004054837 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE], et al) [A] 1,5 * the whole document * |