EP2044646 - COMPACT POWER SUPPLY DEVICE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE COMPRISING REGULATED COOLING MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO EQUIPEMENTS ELECTRIQUES MOTEUR 2, Rue André Boulle 94000 Créteil / FR | [2009/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAKES, Michel 15, Avenue du Vieux Moulin F-59113 Seclin / FR | 02 /
TELLIER, Richard 7, rue Saint-Ambroise F-75011 Paris / FR | 03 /
VASILESCU, Claudiu 2, Square Vitruve F-75020 Paris / FR | 04 /
GUERIN, Fabien 18, rue Pierre Sémard F-92320 Chatillon / FR | 05 /
MASFARAUD, Julien 9, rue de Mazagran F-75010 Paris / FR | 06 /
ABADIA, Roger 39, Avenue du Nord F-93360 Neuilly-plaisance / FR | [2009/15] | Representative(s) | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Equipements Electriques Moteur Propriété Industrielle 2 Rue André Boulle B.P. 150 94017 Créteil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/31] | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Equipements Electriques Moteur Propriété Industrielle 2 Rue André Boulle B.P. 150 94017 Créteil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/15] | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Equipements Electriques Moteur, Propriété Industrielle, 2, rue André-Boulle, BP 150 94017 Créteil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07803965.8 | 28.06.2007 | [2009/15] | WO2007FR51556 | Priority number, date | FR20060052741 | 30.06.2006 Original published format: FR 0652741 | [2009/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008001017 | Date: | 03.01.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2044646 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2044646 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/10 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
H01M10/625 (EP,US);
H01M10/613 (EP,US);
H01M10/651 (EP,US);
H01M10/6551 (EP,US);
H01M10/6562 (EP,US);
H01M10/6563 (EP,US);
H01M10/658 (EP,US);
H01M10/66 (EP,US);
H01M10/663 (EP,US);
H01M50/202 (EP,US);
H01M50/213 (EP,US);
H01M50/24 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2014/04] | H01M2/10, H01M10/50 | ||
Former IPC [2009/15] | H01M10/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMPAKTE ENERGIEVERSORGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG MIT GEREGELTER KÜHLVORRICHTUNG | [2009/15] | English: | COMPACT POWER SUPPLY DEVICE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE COMPRISING REGULATED COOLING MEANS | [2009/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF COMPACT D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE POUR UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE ÉQUIPE DE MOYENS DE REFROIDISSEMENT RÉGULES | [2009/15] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 20.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 14.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.05.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.06.2007 | AT | 30.07.2014 | CY | 30.07.2014 | CZ | 30.07.2014 | DK | 30.07.2014 | EE | 30.07.2014 | ES | 30.07.2014 | FI | 30.07.2014 | IT | 30.07.2014 | LT | 30.07.2014 | LV | 30.07.2014 | MC | 30.07.2014 | MT | 30.07.2014 | NL | 30.07.2014 | PL | 30.07.2014 | RO | 30.07.2014 | SE | 30.07.2014 | SI | 30.07.2014 | SK | 30.07.2014 | TR | 30.07.2014 | BG | 30.10.2014 | GR | 31.10.2014 | IS | 30.11.2014 | PT | 02.12.2014 | [2017/40] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
MT | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 30.07.2014 | |
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 30.07.2014 | |
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 30.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19730678 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,10 * column 4, line 13 - column 5, line 20; figures 2-5; claim 1 * * column 1, line 9 *; | [XA]DE10202807 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,6,10 * paragraphs [0011] , [0013]; figure 1 * [A] 2,3; | [X]US2005058892 (OVSHINSKY STANFORD R [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6,10 * paragraphs [0027] , [0096] , [0109] , [0111] * * figure 15 *; | [A]US2005174092 (DOUGHERTY THOMAS J [US], et al) [A] 6* figures 5-8 *; | [XA]US2006073378 (HAMERY BRUNO [FR], et al) [X] 1,5-7,9 * paragraphs [0073] , [0083] * * figures 2,4,9,11,12,14; claim 2 * * abstract * [A] 8 | by applicant | DE19730678 | DE10202807 | US2005058892 | US2006073378 |