EP2037828 - MEDICAL DEVICE FOR TISSUE ABLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Les Hôpitaux Universitaires de Genève 24 Rue Micheli-du-Crest 1211 Genève 14 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | For all designated states Les Hôpitaux Universitaires De Geneve 24 Rue Micheli-du-Crest 1211 Genève 14 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERIN, Vitali 259 Route de Malagnou 1225 Chêne-Bourg / CH | 02 /
SANDTNER, Jan Sonnenweg 10 4436 Oberdorf / CH | [2009/13] | Representative(s) | Grosfillier, Philippe ANDRE ROLAND SA IP Attorneys & Services Avenue Collonges 21 1004 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/15] | Grosfillier, Philippe Andre Roland S.A. Avenue Tissot 15 P.O. Box 1255 1001 Lausanne / CH | ||
Former [2011/14] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2011/14] | Micheli & Cie SA Rue de Genève 122 Case Postale 61 1226 Genève-Thônex / CH | ||
Former [2009/13] | Micheli & Cie SA 122, rue de Genève CP 61 1226 Thonex-Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 07804572.1 | 06.07.2007 | [2009/13] | WO2007IB01869 | Priority number, date | WO2006IB01917 | 12.07.2006 Original published format: PCT/IB2006/001917 | [2009/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008010039 | Date: | 24.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2037828 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14, A61B5/06, A61B18/00, A61B18/18, A61M25/01 | [2009/13] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B5/4233 (EP,US);
A61B5/6885 (EP,US);
A61M25/0127 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00351 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR GEWEBEABLATION | [2009/13] | English: | MEDICAL DEVICE FOR TISSUE ABLATION | [2009/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF MEDICAL POUR L'ABLATION DE TISSUS | [2009/13] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/13] | 13.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/27] | 01.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2006106375 (WERNETH RANDELL L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,9 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0119] * [Y] 4,5,7,11; | [X]US2006069385 (LAFONTAINE DANIEL M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10 * figures 1,3,7A,7B * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0037] *; | [X]WO0105306 (EPICOR INC [US]) [X] 1 * figures 1A,1B,3,4 * * page 5, line 1 - line 10 * * page 14, line 2 - page 18, line 14 *; | [X]US5429131 (SCHEINMAN MELVIN M [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 2B,2C,2D,3,4 * * column 4, line 46 - column 6, line 19 * * column 7, line 11 - column 8, line 42 *; | [Y]US2005187545 (HOOVEN MICHAEL D [US], et al) [Y] 4,5 * figures 1,2,8,14,20,23,24 * * paragraphs [0081] - [0090] * * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0130] *; | [Y]WO0069353 (STEREOTAXIS INC [US]) [Y] 7 * figures 1A,1B,1C,15 * * page 6, line 23 - page 9, line 30 * * page 13, line 26 - page 15, line 32 *; | [Y]EP1591058 (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [Y] 11 * figures 2,3A * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * |