EP2081877 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF BULK MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2014 | Change: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | 25.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.08.2014 [2014/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liu, Weihua Stockham 35 5204 Strasswalchen / AT | For all designated states Wustinger, Horst Stockham 35 5204 Strasswalchen / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | For all designated states Liu, Weihua Stockham 35 5204 Strasswalchen / AT | ||
For all designated states Wustinger, Horst Stockham 35 5204 Strasswalchen / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Weihua Stockham 35 5204 Strasswalchen / AT | 02 /
WUSTINGER, Horst Stockham 35 5204 Strasswalchen / AT | 03 /
DULLINGER, Heinz Austrasse 7-10 5061 Elsbethen / AT | [2009/31] | Application number, filing date | 07804621.6 | 18.07.2007 | [2009/31] | WO2007IB02026 | Priority number, date | AT20060001226 | 19.07.2006 Original published format: AT 12262006 | [2009/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008010074 | Date: | 24.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2081877 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C04B20/06 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
C04B20/06 (EP);
F27B19/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B20/06, C04B14/14, C04B20/0088, C04B20/061, C04B20/066, C04B40/0096 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SCHÜTTGUT | [2009/31] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF BULK MATERIAL | [2009/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE MATIÈRE APTE AU DÉVERSEMENT | [2009/31] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 15.09.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 21.10.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 16.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/35] | 28.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/35] | Public notification(s) | Feststellung eines Rechtsverlusts nach Regel 112 (1) EPÜ | Liu, Weihua Stockham 35 5204 Strasswalchen / AT | [2014/22] | Noting of loss of rights pursuant to Rule 112(1) EPC , EPO Form 1070 dated 21-10-2009. | Liu, Weihua Stockham 35 5204 Strasswalchen / AT | [2010/11] | Mitteilung nach Regel 161 und 162 EPÜ, EPA Form 1226 vom 02-07-2009. | Liu, Weihua Stockham 35 5204 Strasswalchen / AT | [2010/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.12.2010 | 31.07.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | JP2002249349 [ ]; | JPH06247756 [ ]; | [Y]US3010911 (ROBINSON DAVID W) [Y] 2-4 * column 2, line 43 - line 61 * * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]DE1207258 (JOHANNES TACKEN) [Y] 2 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 22 * * column 2, line 44 - line 47 *; | [XY]US3488043 (INOUE GIICHI, et al) [X] 1,11,12 * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 40 * [Y] 2-4,6,7; | [Y]DE1771384 (MIAG MUEHLENBAU & IND GMBH) [Y] 6,7 * page 4, paragraph 2 * * figure 5 *; | [A]US3834862 (ELIASSON K) [A] 1-12 * column 3, line 54 - line 68 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US3854972 (KRATOCHVIL M) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 38 - line 43 *; | [A]US4830797 (HORNYOS JANOS [HU], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 3, line 42 - line 45 *; | [A]DE3908172 (GUMBMANN ANDREAS DIPL ING [DE]) [A] 1-12 * page 5, line 47 - line 49 * * page 7, line 16 - line 47 ** figure 1 *; | [A]EP0451964 (LITEROCK INT [ZA]) [A] 1-12 * figure 1 *; | [X]JPH06247756 (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO) [X] 1 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0013] *; | [A]DE4445654 (SANDOZ AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * column 5, line 20 - column 6, line 38 *; | [X]JP2002249349 (TAIHEIYO CEMENT CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0008] - [0011] , [0012] , [0018] - [0023] * * claims 1,3,4 *; | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 04, Database accession no. 2003-042619, XP002467623 & JP2002249349 A 20020906 (TAIHEIYO CEMENT CORP) [ ] * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 40, Database accession no. 1994-322003, XP002467624 & JPH06247756 A 19940906 (HITACHI ZOSEN CORP) [ ] * abstract * |