EP2076206 - EXPANDABLE DENTAL IMPLANTS OF HIGH SURFACE AREA AND METHODS OF EXPANDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dentack Implants Ltd 24 Hata'as St. POB 2405 4464102 Kfar-Saba / IL | [2016/31] |
Former [2009/28] | For all designated states Dentack Implants Ltd Bezalel 7 87516 Ofakim / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VACHTENBERG, Oz 13 Kehilat Odesa 6951113 Tel Aviv / IL | [2016/31] |
Former [2009/28] | 01 /
VACHTENBERG, Oz Keilat Padova 19A 97516 Tel Aviv / IL | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2016/31] |
Former [2009/50] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | ||
Former [2009/28] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham West Midlands B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 07804787.5 | 22.08.2007 | [2009/28] | WO2007IB02396 | Priority number, date | IL20060177848 | 03.09.2006 Original published format: IL 17784806 | [2009/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008029215 | Date: | 13.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2076206 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2076206 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/10, A61C13/08, A61C13/12, A61C13/225, A61C8/00 | [2009/28] | CPC: |
A61C8/0033 (EP,US);
A61C8/00 (KR);
A61C13/10 (KR);
A61C8/0039 (US);
A61C8/0089 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/31] |
Former [2009/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | EXPANDIERBARE DENTALIMPLANTATE MIT GROSSER OBERFLÄCHE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER EXPANSION | [2009/28] | English: | EXPANDABLE DENTAL IMPLANTS OF HIGH SURFACE AREA AND METHODS OF EXPANDING THE SAME | [2009/28] | French: | IMPLANTS DENTAIRES EXTENSIBLES DE SURFACE ÉLEVÉE ET PROCÉDÉ D'EXTENSION DE CEUX-CI | [2009/28] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/28] | 26.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.08.2007 | AT | 03.08.2016 | BE | 03.08.2016 | CY | 03.08.2016 | CZ | 03.08.2016 | DK | 03.08.2016 | EE | 03.08.2016 | FI | 03.08.2016 | LT | 03.08.2016 | LV | 03.08.2016 | MC | 03.08.2016 | NL | 03.08.2016 | PL | 03.08.2016 | RO | 03.08.2016 | SE | 03.08.2016 | SI | 03.08.2016 | SK | 03.08.2016 | TR | 03.08.2016 | IE | 22.08.2016 | LU | 22.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | BG | 03.11.2016 | GR | 04.11.2016 | IS | 03.12.2016 | PT | 05.12.2016 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 22.08.2007 | |
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
TR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 22.08.2016 | ||
LU | 22.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 22.08.2007 | |
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 22.08.2016 | ||
LU | 22.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 22.08.2016 | ||
LU | 22.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 22.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 03.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]GB1291470 (AGA AB [SE]) [X] 1,5 * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 71; figures 5,6 * [A] 2-4,7-11,15 [I] 12-14; | [XAI]WO03055403 (KWON JONG-JIN [KR]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 30; figures 1-4b * [A] 2-11,15 [I] 12-14; | [XI]US2005113917 (CHAE SOO-KYUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1-7,15 * paragraphs [0029] - [0032]; figures 2-6 * [I] 8-14; | [A]US2006106416 (RAYMOND DOUGLAS [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0057]; figures 1-31 * | International search | [Y]US5417569 (PERISSE JEAN [FR]); | [Y]US5782918 (KLARDIE MICHAEL ROBERT [US], et al); | [Y]US6007337 (BAUER ERNST [DE]) | by applicant | US2005113917 | US2006106416 |