EP2067273 - ACCESS POINT PLANNING MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS, MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2012/49] |
Former [2009/24] | For all designated states Designart Networks Ltd 4 Haharoshet St 43657 Ra'anana / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARAK, OZ 19 Hacohenim St 45267 Hod Hasharon / IL | 02 /
TOUBOUL, ASSAF 11a Amnon Vetamar St Ramat Poleg 42202 Natanya / IL | [2016/34] |
Former [2009/24] | 01 /
BARAK, OZ 19 Hacohenim St 45267 Hod Hasharon / IL | ||
02 /
TOUBOUL, ASSAF 11a Amnon Vetamar St Ramat Poleg 42202 Natanya / IL | Representative(s) | Wegner, Hans, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2016/34] |
Former [2012/49] | Wegner, Hans, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/36] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/24] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07805568.8 | 09.09.2007 | [2009/24] | WO2007IL01108 | Priority number, date | US20060843183P | 08.09.2006 Original published format: US 843183 P | US20070623110 | 15.01.2007 Original published format: US 623110 | [2009/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008029411 | Date: | 13.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2067273 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2067273 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W84/00, H04W24/02 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
H04W28/18 (EP,US);
H04B7/0417 (EP,US);
H04W16/10 (EP,US);
H04W52/42 (EP,US);
H04W92/20 (EP,US);
H04W16/18 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/30] | H04W84/00 | ||
Former IPC [2009/24] | H04B7/00, H04Q7/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/34] |
Former [2009/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ZUGANGSPUNKT-PLANUNGSMECHANISMUS | [2009/24] | English: | ACCESS POINT PLANNING MECHANISM | [2009/24] | French: | MÉCANISME DE PLANIFICATION DES POINTS D'ACCÈS | [2009/24] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 29.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.09.2007 | AT | 24.08.2016 | BE | 24.08.2016 | CY | 24.08.2016 | CZ | 24.08.2016 | DK | 24.08.2016 | EE | 24.08.2016 | ES | 24.08.2016 | FI | 24.08.2016 | IS | 24.08.2016 | IT | 24.08.2016 | LT | 24.08.2016 | LV | 24.08.2016 | MC | 24.08.2016 | NL | 24.08.2016 | PL | 24.08.2016 | RO | 24.08.2016 | SE | 24.08.2016 | SI | 24.08.2016 | SK | 24.08.2016 | TR | 24.08.2016 | IE | 09.09.2016 | LU | 09.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | MT | 30.09.2016 | BG | 24.11.2016 | GR | 25.11.2016 | PT | 26.12.2016 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 09.09.2007 | |
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
TR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 09.09.2016 | ||
LU | 09.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 09.09.2007 | |
AT | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 09.09.2016 | ||
LU | 09.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 09.09.2016 | ||
LU | 09.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 09.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 09.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 09.09.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
BE | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | AT | 24.08.2016 | |
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
SE | 24.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 24.08.2016 | |
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 24.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO02058341 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 6,7,12 * page 13, line 2 - page 24, line 24; figures 1, 2, 5 * [Y] 8-11; | [Y]US2002159409 (WOLFE CHARLES [US], et al) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0041] *; | [Y]US2004162093 (BEVAN DAVID [GB], et al) [Y] 9-11 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0080]; figures 2-5 *; | [A]US2004162115 (SMITH MARTIN [GB], et al) [A] 6-12 * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0107]; figures 2a, 2b, 3a *; | [A]US2004166867 (HAWE WILLIAM [US]) [A] 6-12 * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0167] *; | [A]US2005277443 (OZLUTURK FATIH M [US]) [A] 6-12 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US7015809 (SAYERS IAN [US], et al) [A] 6-12* column 7, line 56 - column 9, line 25 * | International search | [Y]US2004166871 (BACKES FLOYD [US], et al); | [Y]US2006193300 (RAWAT JAI [US], et al) | by applicant | WO02058341 | US2002159409 | US2005277443 |