EP2061464 - COMBINATION THERAPY FOR TUMORAL DISEASE TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2012 [2012/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ramot, at Tel Aviv University Ltd. P.O.B. 39296 61392 Tel Aviv / IL | [2009/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FISHELSON, Zvi 6 Kehilat Padova Street 69404 Tel-aviv / IL | 02 /
PILZER, David 35 Geulim Street 58404 Holon / IL | [2009/22] | Representative(s) | Fichter, Robert Arno Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2009/22] | Fichter, Robert Arno Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères L-1274 Howald / LU | Application number, filing date | 07805591.0 | 11.09.2007 | [2009/22] | WO2007IL01132 | Priority number, date | US20060844398P | 14.09.2006 Original published format: US 844398 P | [2009/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008032324 | Date: | 20.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2061464 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4439, A61K39/395, A61P35/00 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
A61K31/4439 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4439, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON TUMORERKRANKUNGEN | [2009/22] | English: | COMBINATION THERAPY FOR TUMORAL DISEASE TREATMENT | [2009/22] | French: | THÉRAPIE COMBINÉE POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE MALADIE TUMORALE | [2009/22] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 31.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/39] | 10.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2006022344 ; | [YX]EP0527494 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-22 * example - * [X] 3; | [DYX]US5670530 (CHEN LAN BO [US], et al) [DY] 1-22 * example -; claim - * * See dosages at column 45, lines 1-6 * [X] 3,22; | [X]WO0180884 (IDEC PHARMA CORP [US]) [X] 1-5,7-10,13,14,18 * See page 1, line 12, preferred compound "Rituximab" * * page 2, line 12 - page 3, line 8 * * See page 52, line 20 administration of rituximab (Rituxan) * * Exammples 1-5 * * See page 23, line 25 and page 73, line 28 "ellitinium acetate" *; | [X]WO0212194 (AVENTIS PHARMA SA [FR]) [X] 1-5,8-10,13 * See delocalised lipid cations of page 3, lins 20-25 * * See combinations page 7, line 8, combinations with herceptin (trastuzumab) * * claim - *; | [X]WO2004072027 (AVENTIS PHARMA SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-5,8-10,13 * claim - * * See the delocalized lipophilic cations of claim 1 * * See compounds of examples 1-15 * * See page 21, line 11 combinations with trastuzumab *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2006, no. 23, Database accession no. 2006-221772, XP002471602 & WO2006022344 A 20060302 (DOKURITSU GYOSEI HOJIN SANGYO GIJUTSU SO) [Y] 1-22 * abstract * | [Y] - BRITTEN C D ET AL, "A phase I and pharmacokinetic study of the mitochondrial-specific rhodacyanine dye analog MKT 077.", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH : AN OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH JAN 2000, (200001), vol. 6, no. 1, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 42 - 49, XP002471599 [Y] 1-22 * abstract * * See results at page 45 * * See discussion at page 47 * * See page 48, second column last paragraph and page 49 first paragraph * | [Y] - ABDUL MANSOOR ET AL, "Potentiation of the antiproliferative activity of MKT-077 by loperamide, diltiazem and tamoxifen.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (200311), Database accession no. NLM14534737, XP002471601 [Y] 1-22 * abstract * | [ ] - ONCOLOGY REPORTS 2003 NOV-DEC, (200311), vol. 10, no. 6, ISSN 1021-335X, pages 2023 - 2026 | [Y] - MODICA-NAPOLITANO JOSEPHINE S ET AL, "The selective in vitro cytotoxicity of carcinoma cells by AZT is enhanced by concurrent treatment with delocalized lipophilic cations.", CANCER LETTERS 30 JUL 2003, (20030730), vol. 198, no. 1, ISSN 0304-3835, pages 59 - 68, XP002471600 [Y] 1-22 * abstract * * figures 3,4 * * See introduction, pages 59, 60 * * See page 66, first column last paragraph and page 67, first paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-3835(03)00274-X | [Y] - WADHWA RENU ET AL, "Selective toxicity of MKT-077 to cancer cells is mediated by its binding to the hsp70 family protein mot-2 and reactivation of p53 function", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (20001215), vol. 60, no. 24, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 6818 - 6821, XP002271905 [Y] 1-22 * the whole document * | [Y] - PILZER DAVID ET AL, "Mortalin/GRP75 promotes release of membrane vesicles from immune attacked cells and protection from complement-mediated lysis", INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOLOGY, (200509), vol. 17, no. 9, ISSN 0953-8178, pages 1239 - 1248, XP002471617 [Y] 1-22 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/intimm/dxh300 |