EP2063085 - ENGINE WITH VARIABLE STROKE CHARACTERISTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/22] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEZURU, Akinori c/o HONDA R & D CO., LTD. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Shigekazu c/o HONDA R & D CO., LTD. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIKAWA, Taichi c/o HONDA R & D CO., LTD. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2009/22] | Representative(s) | Herzog, Markus, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/22] | Herzog, Markus, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07806674.3 | 04.09.2007 | [2009/22] | WO2007JP67219 | Priority number, date | JP20060247264 | 12.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006247264 | JP20060259578 | 25.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006259578 | [2009/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008032608 | Date: | 20.03.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2063085 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2063085 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.03.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F02B75/04, F01B9/04, F01B31/14, F02B75/32, F02D15/02, F02F7/00 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
F02B75/048 (EP,US);
F02D15/02 (EP,US);
F01L1/185 (EP,US);
F01L1/20 (EP,US);
F01L2001/0537 (EP,US);
F01L2305/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2009/51] |
Former [2009/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOTOR MIT VARIABLEN HUBEIGENSCHAFTEN | [2009/22] | English: | ENGINE WITH VARIABLE STROKE CHARACTERISTICS | [2009/22] | French: | MOTEUR À CARACTÉRISTIQUES DE COURSE VARIABLES | [2009/22] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2009 | Translation filed | 27.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 28.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.09.2010 | [2011/35] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1674693 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,7-14 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1-8 *; | [X]JP2003322036 (NISSAN MOTOR, et al) [X] 1,3,5-13 * figures 3,15,17,21-34 *; | [A]EP1659276 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0033]; figure 7 *; | [A]EP1593822 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0010]; figures 1-3 *; | [E]EP2022958 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [E] 1 * figures 1-7 * | International search | [X]JP2005030233 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [X]JP2002317663 (NIPPON SOKEN, et al); | [A]JP2003322036 (NISSAN MOTOR, et al) | by applicant | JP2006177192 | JPH09228858 |