EP2062769 - STRUCTURE FOR AIR-COOLING VEHICLE-MOUNTED OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2018/43] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2009/22] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEMOTO, Atsuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2018/43] |
Former [2009/22] | 01 /
NEMOTO, Atsuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi; 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/43] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2009/22] | Albutt, Anthony John D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07806735.2 | 05.09.2007 | [2009/22] | WO2007JP67292 | Priority number, date | JP20060241922 | 06.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006241922 | [2009/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008029837 | Date: | 13.03.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2062769 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2062769 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.03.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60K1/04, B60J7/12, B60K11/06, B60H1/22, B60J7/22, B60K6/28, B60L3/00, B60H1/24 | [2011/18] | CPC: |
B60K1/04 (EP,US);
B60H1/00278 (EP,US);
B60H1/00407 (EP,US);
B60J7/223 (EP,US);
B60L1/003 (EP,US);
B60L58/26 (EP,US);
B60H2001/003 (EP,US);
B60K2001/005 (EP,US);
B60K2001/0416 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/22] | B60K1/04, B60J7/12, B60K11/06, B60H1/22, B60J7/22, B60K6/28, B60L3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2018/43] |
Former [2009/40] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | STRUKTUR ZUR LUFTKÜHLUNG EINES AM FAHRZEUG BEFESTIGTEN OBJEKTS | [2009/22] | English: | STRUCTURE FOR AIR-COOLING VEHICLE-MOUNTED OBJECT | [2009/22] | French: | STRUCTURE POUR LE REFROIDISSEMENT À AIR D'UN OBJET MONTÉ SUR VÉHICULE | [2009/22] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2009 | Translation filed | 30.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 30.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 07.04.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.05.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19908502 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 40 - line 55 * * column 3 * * figures 1,3 *; | [X]US2004010357 (KUBOTA SHINYA [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-8 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0028] * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2005061498 (TOHDA ISAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0083] , [0100] - paragraph [0116] * * figures 1,6 *; | [A]WO2005092650 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,3 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0040] ** figures 1,3 *; | [A]JP2006117096 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JPS6341226 (MAZDA MOTOR); | [Y]JPH033062Y ; | [A]JPH0419317U ; | [Y]JP2001328416 (DENSO CORP, et al); | [A]JP2003178815 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2006012471 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2006015862 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [Y]JP2006224906 (MAZDA MOTOR, et al) | Examination | US5305613 | EP0648632 | US5673747 | by applicant | DE19908502 | JP2005088752 |