EP2172374 - TONGUE, AND ITS MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enshu Co., Ltd. 748 Kamiaraya Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-0831 / JP | [2010/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Tadao c/o ENSHU Co., LTD 748, Kamiaraya Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-0831 / JP | [2013/11] |
Former [2010/14] | 01 /
TADAO, Ito c/o ENSHU Co., LTD 748, Kamiaraya Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-0831 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/14] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07806945.7 | 07.09.2007 | [2010/14] | WO2007JP67513 | Priority number, date | JP20070167431 | 26.06.2007 Original published format: JP 2007167431 | [2010/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009001482 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | JA | [2009/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2172374 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2172374 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/12, A44B11/25 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
A44B11/2561 (EP,KR,US);
B60R22/18 (KR);
B21D53/46 (KR);
B22F2003/166 (KR);
Y10T24/4088 (EP,US);
Y10T24/45241 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4998 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/14] | B60R22/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | ZUNGE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2010/14] | English: | TONGUE, AND ITS MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2010/14] | French: | LANGUETTE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2010/14] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2010 | Translation filed | 21.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 21.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 11.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.09.2007 | AT | 17.07.2013 | BE | 17.07.2013 | BG | 17.07.2013 | CY | 17.07.2013 | CZ | 17.07.2013 | DK | 17.07.2013 | EE | 17.07.2013 | FI | 17.07.2013 | IT | 17.07.2013 | LT | 17.07.2013 | LV | 17.07.2013 | MC | 17.07.2013 | MT | 17.07.2013 | NL | 17.07.2013 | PL | 17.07.2013 | RO | 17.07.2013 | SE | 17.07.2013 | SI | 17.07.2013 | SK | 17.07.2013 | TR | 17.07.2013 | IE | 07.09.2013 | LU | 07.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | FR | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | GB | 17.10.2013 | GR | 18.10.2013 | ES | 28.10.2013 | IS | 17.11.2013 | PT | 18.11.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
MT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
TR | 17.07.2013 | ||
IE | 07.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
GB | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
IE | 07.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
FR | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
GB | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
IE | 07.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
GB | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
IE | 07.09.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 17.07.2013 | |
PT | 18.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001014997 (SUZUKI YUKIO [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,7,10-12 * abstract *; | [A]JP2002037022 (ENSHU CLOTH) [A] 1,4,7 * abstract * | International search | [X]WO2006132129 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE], et al); | [A]JP2006182103 (TKJ KK); | [A]JP2000176664 (NISSAN MOTOR) | by applicant | US2001014997 |