EP2063479 - FUEL BATTERY CELL BODY, FUEL BATTERY CELL UNIT, FUEL BATTERY CELL STACK, AND FUEL BATTERY CONTAINING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOTO LTD. 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome Kokurakita-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | [2012/47] |
Former [2009/22] | For all designated states Toto Ltd. 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome Kokura-Kita-Ku Kitakyushu, Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Naoki TOTO LTD. 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome Kokurakita-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | 02 /
KAWAKAMI, Akira TOTO LTD. 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome Kokurakita-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 802-8601 / JP | [2009/22] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/22] | Zimmermann & Partner Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07807225.3 | 13.09.2007 | [2009/22] | WO2007JP67818 | Priority number, date | JP20060251530 | 15.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006251530 | [2009/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008032773 | Date: | 20.03.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2063479 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.03.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02, H01M8/24, H01M8/04, H01M8/12 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
H01M8/12 (EP,US);
H01M8/0252 (EP,US);
H01M8/04201 (EP,US);
H01M8/243 (EP);
H01M8/2465 (EP);
H01M8/2485 (EP);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/22] | H01M8/02, H01M8/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/22] | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFBATTERIE-ZELLENKÖRPER, BRENNSTOFFBATTERIE-ZELLENEINHEIT, BRENNSTOFFBATTERIE-ZELLENSTAPEL UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE BRENNSTOFFBATTERIE | [2009/22] | English: | FUEL BATTERY CELL BODY, FUEL BATTERY CELL UNIT, FUEL BATTERY CELL STACK, AND FUEL BATTERY CONTAINING THEM | [2009/22] | French: | CORPS, UNITÉ ET EMPILEMENT DE PILE DE BATTERIE À COMBUSTIBLE ET BATTERIE À COMBUSTIBLE LES CONTENANT | [2009/22] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2009 | Translation filed | 13.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 22.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/29] | 25.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.02.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0443259 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [X] 18 * column 4, line 40 - column 7, line 32; figure 1 *; | [X]JPH0513090 (MEIKI SEISAKUSHO KK) [X] 18 * abstract *; | [X]EP1482590 (SANYO ELECTRIC BIOMED CO LTD [JP]) [X] 18 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0076]; figures 7-15 *; | [A]US2006051642 (FINNERTY CAINE [US]) [A] 18* the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH10189016 (KYOCERA CORP); | [A]JP2002289249 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL, et al); | [A]JP2002313374 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) | by applicant | JPH05101842 | JP2002289249 |