EP2032780 - POOL CLEANER DEBRIS BAG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pentair Water Pool and Spa, Inc. 400 Regency Forest Drive, Suite 300 Cary, NC 27518 / US | [2016/35] |
Former [2009/11] | For all designated states Pentair Water Pool and Spa, Inc. 10951 West Los Angeles Avenue Moorpark, CA 93021 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOPALAN, Suresh, Cherulassery 306 Durington Place Cary, NC 27511 / US | [2009/11] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2016/35] |
Former [2009/11] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 07809659.1 | 19.06.2007 | [2009/11] | WO2007US14232 | Priority number, date | US20060455404 | 19.06.2006 Original published format: US 455404 | [2009/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007149412 | Date: | 27.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2032780 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2032780 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E04H4/16 | [2009/11] | CPC: |
B01D29/23 (US);
B01D29/27 (US);
B01D35/16 (KR);
E04H4/16 (KR);
E04H4/1654 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T24/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/35] |
Former [2009/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MÜLLBEUTEL FÜR POOLREINIGER | [2009/11] | English: | POOL CLEANER DEBRIS BAG | [2009/11] | French: | SAC À DÉCHETS POUR ASPIRATEUR DE PISCINE | [2009/11] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 01.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.06.2007 | AT | 31.08.2016 | BE | 31.08.2016 | CY | 31.08.2016 | CZ | 31.08.2016 | DK | 31.08.2016 | EE | 31.08.2016 | ES | 31.08.2016 | FI | 31.08.2016 | IT | 31.08.2016 | LT | 31.08.2016 | LV | 31.08.2016 | MC | 31.08.2016 | NL | 31.08.2016 | PL | 31.08.2016 | RO | 31.08.2016 | SE | 31.08.2016 | SI | 31.08.2016 | SK | 31.08.2016 | TR | 31.08.2016 | BG | 30.11.2016 | GR | 01.12.2016 | IS | 31.12.2016 | PT | 02.01.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 19.06.2007 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
TR | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 19.06.2007 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 19.06.2007 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
ES | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 31.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2006014746 (HENKIN LABY LLC [US]; HENKIN MELVYN LANE [US]; LABY JORDAN M [US]) [X] 1,6-11,14,15 * paragraphs [0033] - [0043]; figures 1-5; claim 1 * [A] 2-5,12,13; | [A]US2004232058 (SILVERSTEIN STEVEN M [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US4618420 (ALANIS J JESUS [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-3 * | International search | [X]US4618420 (ALANIS J JESUS [US]); | [Y]US4296529 (BROWN STANLEY E); | [Y]US3176450 (WEINSTEIN ADOLPH J); | [Y]USD438373S (RILEY PHIL [US]) | by applicant | US4618420 | US2004232058 | WO2006014746 |