EP2047375 - METHODS, SYSTEMS, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCTS FOR PROVIDING GEOGRAPHICALLY DIVERSE IP MULTIMEDIA SUBSYSTEM (IMS) INSTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tekelec 26580 West Agoura Road Calabasas, CA 91302 / US | [2009/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPRAGUE, David, Michael 2316 Heartley Drive Raleigh, NC 27615 / US | 02 /
LIPPS, Thomas 2004 Patapsco Drive Apex, NC 27523 / US | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/16] | Skuhra, Udo Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstraße 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07810117.7 | 10.07.2007 | [2009/16] | WO2007US15290 | Priority number, date | US20060830418P | 12.07.2006 Original published format: US 830418 P | US20060584247 | 20.10.2006 Original published format: US 584247 | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008008226 | Date: | 17.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2047375 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
H04L65/1016 (EP,US);
H04L69/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEME UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKTE ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG GEOGRAFISCH UNTERSCHIEDLICHER IP-MULTIMEDIA-SUBSYSTEM (IMS)-INSTANZEN | [2009/16] | English: | METHODS, SYSTEMS, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCTS FOR PROVIDING GEOGRAPHICALLY DIVERSE IP MULTIMEDIA SUBSYSTEM (IMS) INSTANCES | [2009/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉS, SYSTÈMES ET PRODUITS DE PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR PERMETTANT DE FOURNIR DES INSTANCES DE SOUS-SYSTÈMES MULTIMÉDIA IP (IMS) DIVERS GÉOGRAPHIQUEMENT | [2009/16] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 01.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/30] | 09.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2006090001 (COLLINS DAVID A [US]); | [Y]US2005271055 (STUPKA JEAN-MARIE [DE]); | [Y]US2003005350 (KONING MAARTEN [CA], et al) |