EP2041317 - MICRO-RNA-BASED METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF COLON CANCER-RELATED DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Ohio State University Research Foundation Research Foundation Building Building 200 1960 Kenny Road Columbus, OH 43210-1063 / US | For all designated states The Government of the United States of America as represented by the Secretary of the Department of Health and Human Services National Institutes of Health Office of Technology Transfer 6011 Executive Boulevard Suite 325 Rockville, MD 20852-3804 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/14] | For all designated states The Ohio State University Research Foundation Research Foundation Building Building 200 1960 Kenny Road Columbus, OH 43210-1063 / US | ||
For all designated states The Government Of The United States Of America As Represented By The Secretary Of The Department Of Health And Human Services National Institutes of Health Office of Technology Transfer 6011 Executive Boulevard Suite 325 Rockville, MD 20852-3804 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CROCE, Carlo, M. 2140 Cambridge Boulevard Columbus, OH 43221 / US | 02 /
HARRIS, Curtis, C. 4720 Waverly Ave. Garrett Part, MD 20896-0077 / US | 03 /
SCHETTER, Aaron, J. 393 Congressional Lane Rockville, MD 20852 / US | [2009/31] |
Former [2009/18] | 01 /
CROCE, Carlo, M. 2140 Cambridge Boulevard Columbus, OH 43221 / US | ||
02 /
HARRIS, Curtis, C. 4720 Waverly Ave. Garrett Part, MD 20896-0077 / US | |||
03 /
SCHETTER, Aaron, J. 8750 Georgia Ave, Apt 1120A Silver Springs, MD 20910 / US | |||
Former [2009/14] | 01 /
CROCE, Carlo, M. 2140 Cambridge Boulevard Columbus, OH 43221 / US | ||
02 /
HARRIS, Curtis, C. Silver Spring, MD / US | |||
03 /
SCHETTER, Aaron, J. Garrett Park, MD / US | Representative(s) | Turner, Craig Robert AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/14] | Turner, Craig Robert A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 07810382.7 | 12.07.2007 | [2009/14] | WO2007US15892 | Priority number, date | US20060807304P | 13.07.2006 Original published format: US 807304 P | US20070932736P | 01.06.2007 Original published format: US 932736 P | [2009/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008008430 | Date: | 17.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2041317 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6809 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,CN,US);
C12N15/113 (US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C12N2310/113 (US);
C12N2310/141 (US);
C12N2320/30 (US);
C12Q2525/207 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q2600/112 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q2600/118 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q2600/136 (EP,CN,US);
C12Q2600/158 (CN);
C12Q2600/178 (EP,CN,US);
Y10T436/143333 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKRO-RNA-BASIERTE VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR DIAGNOSE UND BEHANDLUNG VON ERKRANKUNGEN IN ZUSAMMENHANG MIT DARMKREBS | [2009/14] | English: | MICRO-RNA-BASED METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF COLON CANCER-RELATED DISEASES | [2009/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS À BASE DE MICRO-ARN POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC ET LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES APPARENTÉES AU CANCER DU COLON | [2009/20] |
Former [2009/14] | PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS A BASE DE MICRO-ARN POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC ET LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES APPARENTEES AU CANCER DU COLON | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 02.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/50] | 26.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/50] | Divisional application(s) | EP11170608.1 / EP2369017 | EP11196190.0 / EP2455492 | EP11196250.2 / EP2455493 | EP11196253.6 / EP2455494 | EP11196254.4 / EP2436782 | EP11196256.9 / EP2436783 | EP11196261.9 / EP2436784 | EP11196262.7 / EP2436785 | EP11196264.3 / EP2436786 | EP11196265.0 / EP2436787 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.10.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 14.10.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.10.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9809510 (FLOREY HOWARD INST [AU], et al) [X] 35,36 * claim 9 ** the whole document *; | [Y]US6258541 (CHAPKIN ROBERT S [US], et al) [Y] 19 * example 4 *; | [Y]US2004265930 (SUN LE [US], et al) [Y] 17,18 * claim 18 *; | [Y]US2005069918 (CLARET FRANCOIS [US]) [Y] 10,26,27 * paragraphs [0052] , [0011] , [0145] *; | [YA]US2006105360 (CROCE CARLO M [US], et al) [Y] 20-22 * table 7 * * the whole document * [A] 1-6,8-19,23-36,38; | [A] - MICHAEL M Z ET AL, "REDUCED ACCUMULATION OF SPECIFIC MICRORNAS IN COLORECTAL NEOPLASIA", MOLECULAR CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH (A AC R), US, (20031001), vol. 1, no. 12, ISSN 1541-7786, pages 882 - 891, XP009051992 [A] 1-6,8-36,38 * abstract * * table 1 * * the whole document * | [XY] - VOLINIA STEFANO ET AL, "A microRNA expression signature of human solid tumors defines cancer gene targets", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20060214), vol. 103, no. 7, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 2257 - 2261, XP002460699 [X] 1-6,8,9,11-16,23-25,28-34,38 * page 2260, column 1 - column 2; tables 1,2,6 * * the whole document * [Y] 10,17-22,26,27 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0510565103 | International search | [X] - MICHAEL M.Z. ET AL., "REDUCED ACCUMULATION OF SPECIFIC MICRORNAS IN COLORECTAL NEOPLASIA", MOL. CANCER RES., (200310), vol. 1, no. 12, pages 882 - 891, XP009051992 |