EP2044177 - ALTERNATIVE ORGANIC FUEL FORMULATIONS INCLUDING VEGETABLE OIL AND PETROLEUM DIESEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alternative Fuels Group Inc. 101 Quarfelt Road Clinton Corners, NY 12514 / US | [2009/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOMANN, Mark 101 Quarfelt Road Clinton Corners, NY 12514 / US | [2009/15] | Representative(s) | Fairbairn, Angus Chisholm Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | Fairbairn, Angus Chisholm Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07810759.6 | 25.07.2007 | [2009/15] | WO2007US16717 | Priority number, date | US20060833272P | 26.07.2006 Original published format: US 833272 P | US20060872798P | 05.12.2006 Original published format: US 872798 P | US20070878438 | 24.07.2007 Original published format: US 878438 | [2009/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008013848 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2044177 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C10L5/00 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
C10L1/026 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1011 (EP,US);
Y02E50/10 (EP,US);
Y02P30/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ALTERNATIVE ORGANISCHE BRENNSTOFFFORMULIERUNGEN MIT PFLANZLICHEM ÖL UND PETROLEUMDIESEL | [2009/15] | English: | ALTERNATIVE ORGANIC FUEL FORMULATIONS INCLUDING VEGETABLE OIL AND PETROLEUM DIESEL | [2009/15] | French: | FORMULATIONS ALTERNATIVES DE CARBURANT ORGANIQUE COMPRENANT DE L'HUILE VÉGÉTALE ET DU DIESEL DE PÉTROLE | [2009/15] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2008 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 24.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/37] | 08.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2005160662 (JORDAN FREDERICK L [US]); | [Y]US2003097783 (JORDAN FREDERICK L [US]); | [Y]US2003167682 (CRAWFORD STEPHEN R [US], et al) | [Y] - TICKELL J. AND TICKELL K., "Fuel for the New Millenium.", (199908), pages 84 - 85 |