EP2061423 - AQUEOUS COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING MONOESTER SALTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renessenz LLC 601 Crestwood Street Jacksonville, FL 32208 / US | [2011/44] |
Former [2009/22] | For all designated states Millennium Specialty Chemicals, Inc. 1221 McKinney Houston, TX 77010 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERMAN, Mark B. 1645 Linkside Court North Atlantic Beach, Florida 32233 / US | 02 /
SNOW, Joe W. 113 Greentree Circle Kingsland, Georgia 31548 / US | [2009/22] | Representative(s) | De Hoop, Eric Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Koninginnegracht 19 2514 AB Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/40] | De Hoop, Eric Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Dr Kuyperstraat 6 2514 BB Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2009/22] | De Hoop, Eric Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Dr Kuyperstraat 6 2514 BB Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 07811202.6 | 08.08.2007 | [2009/22] | WO2007US17668 | Priority number, date | US20060517798 | 08.09.2006 Original published format: US 517798 | [2009/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008030312 | Date: | 13.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2061423 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2061423 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/06, A61K8/67, A61Q13/00, A61Q19/00, A61K8/37 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61K8/068 (EP,US);
A61K8/37 (EP,US);
A61K8/67 (EP,US);
A61Q13/00 (EP,US);
A61K2800/242 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/22] | A61K8/37, A61K8/67, A61Q13/00, A61Q19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT MONOESTER-SALZEN | [2009/22] | English: | AQUEOUS COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING MONOESTER SALTS | [2009/22] | French: | SOLUTIONS AQUEUSES CONTENANT DES SELS MONOESTERS | [2009/22] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 22.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.08.2007 | AT | 02.10.2013 | BE | 02.10.2013 | BG | 02.10.2013 | CY | 02.10.2013 | CZ | 02.10.2013 | DK | 02.10.2013 | EE | 02.10.2013 | FI | 02.10.2013 | IT | 02.10.2013 | LT | 02.10.2013 | LV | 02.10.2013 | MC | 02.10.2013 | MT | 02.10.2013 | NL | 02.10.2013 | PL | 02.10.2013 | RO | 02.10.2013 | SE | 02.10.2013 | SI | 02.10.2013 | SK | 02.10.2013 | TR | 02.10.2013 | GR | 03.01.2014 | IS | 02.02.2014 | PT | 03.02.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 08.08.2007 | |
AT | 02.10.2013 | ||
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
GR | 03.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
GR | 03.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 02.10.2013 | |
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 02.10.2013 | |
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 02.10.2013 | |
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | SI | 02.10.2013 | Cited in | International search | [E]WO2007100450 (MILLENNIUM SPECIALTY CHEM INC [US]) [E] 12 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0282289 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1 * page 4, line 51 - page 5, line 6; example - *; | [Y]WO9811867 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * example 1 *; | [Y]EP1493336 (INT FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC [US]) [Y] 1-11 * page 4, line 5 - line 53 *; | [Y]US3703481 (BARKER GRAHAM, et al) [Y] 1-11 * example - *; | [Y]WO9707771 (MANE V FILS SA [FR], et al) [Y] 1-11 * examples 6-8 *; | [Y] - BANSHO K ET AL, "Mono:alcohol ester of maleic acid prodn. - by reacting maleic anhydride and alcohol in presence of alkali metal salt of organic acid under nitrogen atmos", WPI / THOMSON, (19790224), XP002444425 [Y] 12,13 * abstract * | [Y] - SHIMIZU T ET AL, "SYNTHESIS OF DICARBOXYLIC MONOESTERS WITH CYCLIC ANHYDRIDES UNDER HIGH PRESSURE", SYNLETT, THIEME INTERNATIONAL, STUTTGART, DE, (199506), no. 6, ISSN 0936-5214, pages 650 - 652, XP002932641 [Y] 12,13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-1995-5033 | by applicant | US5635190 | US2006084589 | US3762932 | CA1329104 | US4714565 | US5725865 | US6121315 | US6365215 |