EP2023752 - APPARATUSES, SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CONFIRMING USE OF AN ORAL APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scientific Intake Limited Co. 3575 Piedmont Road Building 15, Suite 1050 Atlanta, GA 30305 / US | [2009/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LONGLEY, William H. 470 W. Paces Ferry Road, NW Atlanta, GA 30305 / US | [2009/08] | Representative(s) | Charig, Raymond Julian Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Charig, Raymond Julian Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07812014.4 | 04.06.2007 | [2009/08] | WO2007US70360 | Priority number, date | US20060422279 | 05.06.2006 Original published format: US 422279 | [2009/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007143624 | Date: | 13.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2023752 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A24F25/00 | [2009/08] | CPC: |
A61F5/566 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM BESTÄTIGEN DER VERWENDUNG EINER ORALEN ANWENDUNG | [2009/08] | English: | APPARATUSES, SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CONFIRMING USE OF AN ORAL APPLIANCE | [2009/08] | French: | DISPOSITIFS, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE CONFIRMATION DE L'UTILISATION D'UN APPAREIL ORAL | [2009/08] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 03.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/31] | 08.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5245592 (KUEMMEL DIETMAR [DE], et al); | [Y]US2006068353 (ABOLFATHI AMIR [US], et al); | [Y]US5519699 (OHSAWA TOMOKI [JP]); | [XP]US2006166157 (RAHMAN TARIQ [US], et al) |