EP2041750 - MEMORIES WITH FRONT END PRECHARGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S. Aqua Semiconductor, LLC 2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400 Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [2009/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAO, G.R. Mohan 800 West Renner Road, Apt. 1328 Richardson TX 75080 / US | [2009/20] |
Former [2009/14] | 01 /
RAO, G.R. Mohan 1404 Westmont Drive McKinney, TX 75070 / US | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Kazi, Ilya Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2010/25] | Kazi, Ilya Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2009/14] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 07812687.7 | 06.07.2007 | [2009/14] | WO2007US72974 | Priority number, date | US20060819296P | 07.07.2006 Original published format: US 819296 P | US20070771853 | 29.06.2007 Original published format: US 771853 | [2009/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008006075 | Date: | 10.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2041750 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2041750 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G11C7/12, G11C7/06, G11C7/00 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
G11C5/005 (EP);
G11C5/14 (KR);
G11C11/405 (EP);
G11C11/4094 (EP);
G11C11/4097 (EP);
G11C7/12 (EP,KR);
G11C7/18 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/14] | G11C7/06, G11C7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPEICHEREINHEITEN MIT FRONT-END-VORLADUNG | [2009/14] | English: | MEMORIES WITH FRONT END PRECHARGE | [2009/14] | French: | MÉMOIRES AVEC PRÉCHARGE FRONTALE | [2009/14] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 21.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.08.2010 | BE | 25.08.2010 | CY | 25.08.2010 | CZ | 25.08.2010 | DK | 25.08.2010 | EE | 25.08.2010 | FI | 25.08.2010 | HU | 25.08.2010 | IT | 25.08.2010 | LT | 25.08.2010 | LV | 25.08.2010 | MT | 25.08.2010 | NL | 25.08.2010 | PL | 25.08.2010 | RO | 25.08.2010 | SE | 25.08.2010 | SI | 25.08.2010 | SK | 25.08.2010 | TR | 25.08.2010 | BG | 25.11.2010 | GR | 26.11.2010 | ES | 06.12.2010 | IS | 25.12.2010 | PT | 27.12.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
BE | 25.08.2010 | ||
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
MT | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
TR | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
ES | 06.12.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
BE | 25.08.2010 | ||
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
MT | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
ES | 06.12.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
BE | 25.08.2010 | ||
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
ES | 06.12.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
BE | 25.08.2010 | ||
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5636174 (RAO G R MOHAN [US]) [Y] 1-3,5-8,10-16 * column 8, lines 24-47; figures 2-4 *; | [Y]US6779076 (SHIRLEY BRIAN M [US]) [Y] 1-3,5-8,10-16 * column 2, lines 45-47 ** column 5, lines 1-29; figure 3A * | International search | [A]US6512715 (OKAMOTO TAKEO [JP], et al); | [X]US6529412 (CHEN PAU-LING [US], et al) |