EP2040654 - REMOTE SENSING AND ACTUATION OF FLUID OF INNER EAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Med-El Elektromedizinische Geräte GmbH Fürstenweg 77a 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [2009/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOLLY, Claude Karl-Innerebner Str. 95a, C4 A-6020 Innsbruck / AT | [2009/14] | Representative(s) | Lucke, Andreas, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | Lucke, Andreas, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/02] | Lucke, Andreas, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/49] | Froud, Clive Clive Froud & Co Limited 7 Hurst Close Tenterden Ashford Kent TN30 6UG / GB | ||
Former [2009/14] | Froud, Clive Clive Froud & Co Limited 7 Hurst Close Tenterden GB-Kent TN30 6UG / GB | Application number, filing date | 07812959.0 | 16.07.2007 | [2009/14] | WO2007US73572 | Priority number, date | US20060831351P | 17.07.2006 Original published format: US 831351 P | [2009/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008011359 | Date: | 24.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2040654 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2040654 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00, A61N1/05, A61N1/36 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
A61N1/0541 (EP,KR,US);
A61F11/04 (KR);
A61N1/36036 (KR);
A61N1/36038 (EP,US);
H04R25/606 (EP,KR,US);
H04R2420/07 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/14] | A61F11/04, A61N1/05, A61N1/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/14] | Title | German: | FERNERFASSUNG UND BETÄTIGUNG DER INNENOHRFLÜSSIGKEIT | [2012/23] | English: | REMOTE SENSING AND ACTUATION OF FLUID OF INNER EAR | [2009/14] | French: | TÉLÉDÉTECTION ET ACTIONNEMENT DU FLUIDE DE L'OREILLE INTERNE | [2009/14] |
Former [2009/14] | FERNERFASSUNG UND -AKTIVIERUNG DER INNENOHRFLÜSSIGKEIT | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 23.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.07.2007 | AT | 24.10.2012 | BE | 24.10.2012 | CY | 24.10.2012 | CZ | 24.10.2012 | DK | 24.10.2012 | EE | 24.10.2012 | FI | 24.10.2012 | IT | 24.10.2012 | LT | 24.10.2012 | LV | 24.10.2012 | MC | 24.10.2012 | MT | 24.10.2012 | NL | 24.10.2012 | PL | 24.10.2012 | RO | 24.10.2012 | SE | 24.10.2012 | SI | 24.10.2012 | SK | 24.10.2012 | TR | 24.10.2012 | BG | 24.01.2013 | GR | 25.01.2013 | ES | 04.02.2013 | IS | 24.02.2013 | PT | 25.02.2013 | GB | 16.07.2013 | IE | 16.07.2013 | LU | 16.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
MT | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
TR | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
GB | 16.07.2013 | ||
IE | 16.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
GB | 16.07.2013 | ||
IE | 16.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
GB | 16.07.2013 | ||
IE | 16.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
GB | 16.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
MC | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
IT | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
RO | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
EE | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
SK | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
DK | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
BG | 24.01.2013 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 24.10.2012 | |
BE | 24.10.2012 | ||
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 24.10.2012 | |
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
PT | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | BE | 24.10.2012 | |
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
SI | 24.10.2012 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 24.10.2012 | |
CY | 24.10.2012 | ||
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
GR | 25.01.2013 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 24.10.2012 | |
FI | 24.10.2012 | ||
LV | 24.10.2012 | ||
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
PL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 24.10.2012 | |
NL | 24.10.2012 | ||
SE | 24.10.2012 | ||
ES | 04.02.2013 | ||
IS | 24.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 24.10.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6259951 (KUZMA JANUSZ A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7,10-16,19,21,24-28 * column 1, line 11 - column 13, line 66; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3,4,6,8,9,17,18,20,22,23; | [XY]DE3918086 (HORTMANN GMBH, 7449 NECKARTENZLINGEN, DE) [X] 1,2,5,7,10-14 * column 1, line 1 - column 5, line 46; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3,8; | [Y]WO2004024212 (VIBRANT MED EL HEARING TECHNOL [AT], et al) [Y] 3,17 * page 8, line 14 - page 9, line 26; figures 3B,4B *; | [Y]WO03034960 (MED EL ELEKTROMED GERAETE GMBH [AT]) [Y] 4,6,9,18,20,23 * page 1, line 4 - page 27, line 34; figures 1-34 *; | [Y]US6629922 (PURIA SUNIL [US], et al) [Y] 8,22 * column 13, lines 26-47; figure 4K * | by applicant | US6259951 |