EP2086860 - MULTI-PRODUCT TANK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BP Corporation North America Inc. 4101 Winfield Road Warrenville, IL 60555 / US | [2009/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WITHERIDE, Anthony, J. 330 N. Jefferson Street Batavia, IL 60510 / US | [2009/33] | Representative(s) | Hamer, Christopher K., et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/33] | Hamer, Christopher K., et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07813209.9 | 23.07.2007 | [2009/33] | WO2007US74084 | Priority number, date | US20060820425P | 26.07.2006 Original published format: US 820425 P | US20060820415P | 26.07.2006 Original published format: US 820415 P | [2009/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008014203 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2086860 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65D88/34, B65D88/62, B65D90/04, B65D90/48 | [2009/33] | CPC: |
B65D88/62 (EP,US);
B65D88/34 (EP,US);
B65D90/046 (EP,US);
B65D90/047 (EP,US);
B65D90/48 (EP,US);
B65D2590/046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TANK FÜR MEHRERE PRODUKTE | [2009/33] | English: | MULTI-PRODUCT TANK | [2009/33] | French: | RÉSERVOIR MULTIPRODUIT | [2009/33] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 22.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/03] | 01.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2005239169 (KOKUSAI SHIGEN KATSUYO KYOKAI) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]US4723682 (BARBILLAT CLAUDE [US]) [X] 1,3,5 * column 3, lines 16-32,47-53 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US4880135 (NEOU IN-MEEI [US]) [X] 1,3,5 * column 3, lines 54-56 * * column 5, lines 35-50 * * figure 5 *; | [X]EP1477429 (YAMAZAKI AKEHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,6 * column 2, paragraph 16 - column 3, paragraph 22 * * column 6, paragraph 43 - column 7, paragraph 46 * * figures 1,3,4 *; | [XA]US4254887 (BOLD STEPHEN E) [X] 6,8,10 * column 3, line 54 - column 5, line 14 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 4; | [X]WO8103011 (MOREAU M) [X] 6,8 * page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 40 * * figure 6 *; | [XA]JPS59142988 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, et al) [X] 6,9 * figures 5,6 * [A] 4; | [A]FR2001328 (DOWLING HICKEY CHRISTOPH) [A] 1 * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 6 * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2798639 (PETER URBAN) [A] 6 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 36 * * figures 1,2 * |