EP2050141 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THIN-FILM TRANSISTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/17] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A THIN-FILM DEVICE | ||
[2013/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [2009/17] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFFMAN, Randy 1000 NE Circle Blvd. Corvallis, Oregon 97330 / US | 02 /
HERMAN, Gregory S. 1000 NE Circle Blvd. Corvallis, Oregon 97330 / US | [2009/17] | Representative(s) | Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London, WC1V 6HU / GB | [2014/19] |
Former [2011/21] | Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London, WC1V 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2010/02] | Durville, Guillaume, et al Hewlett-Packard Española, S.L. Legal Department Cami de Can Graells, 1-21 Sant Cugat del Valles 08174 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2009/17] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07813375.8 | 26.07.2007 | [2009/17] | WO2007US74397 | Priority number, date | US20060496768 | 31.07.2006 Original published format: US 496768 | [2009/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008016818 | Date: | 07.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2050141 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2050141 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/12, H01L29/786 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
H01L29/7869 (EP,US);
H01L27/1248 (EP,US);
H01L27/1292 (EP,US);
H01L29/78603 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/17] | H01L29/786, H01L21/77 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/17] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DÜNNSCHICHTTRANSISTOREN | [2013/41] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THIN-FILM TRANSISTORS | [2013/41] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE FABRIQUER DES TRANSISTORS À COUCHE MINCE | [2013/41] |
Former [2009/17] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DÜNNSCHICHTBAUELEMENTS | ||
Former [2009/17] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A THIN-FILM DEVICE | ||
Former [2009/17] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE FABRIQUER UN DISPOSITIF À FILM MINCE | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 04.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.07.2007 | AT | 07.05.2014 | BE | 07.05.2014 | BG | 07.05.2014 | CY | 07.05.2014 | CZ | 07.05.2014 | DK | 07.05.2014 | EE | 07.05.2014 | ES | 07.05.2014 | FI | 07.05.2014 | IT | 07.05.2014 | LT | 07.05.2014 | LV | 07.05.2014 | MC | 07.05.2014 | MT | 07.05.2014 | NL | 07.05.2014 | PL | 07.05.2014 | RO | 07.05.2014 | SE | 07.05.2014 | SI | 07.05.2014 | SK | 07.05.2014 | TR | 07.05.2014 | IE | 26.07.2014 | LU | 26.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | GR | 08.08.2014 | IS | 07.09.2014 | PT | 08.09.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 26.07.2007 | |
AT | 07.05.2014 | ||
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
BG | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
IE | 26.07.2014 | ||
LU | 26.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
BG | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
IE | 26.07.2014 | ||
LU | 26.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
BG | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
IE | 26.07.2014 | ||
LU | 26.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
IE | 26.07.2014 | ||
LU | 26.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
IE | 26.07.2014 | ||
LU | 26.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
LU | 26.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
LU | 26.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
LU | 26.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
LU | 26.07.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 07.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005269562 (YANG NAM-CHOUL [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1,4,7 *; | [A]US5583369 (YAMAZAKI SHUNPEI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 17, line 64 - line 67; figure 8 *; | [A]US2006079034 (HOFFMAN RANDY [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 27,30 *; | [PA]WO2006094241 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al) [PA] 1-10 * page 14, line 28 - line 32 *; | [PA]WO2006094231 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al) [PA] 1-10 * paragraph [0040] * | [A] - KUCHEYEV S O ET AL, "Implant isolation of ZnO", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (20030301), vol. 93, no. 5, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 2972 - 2976, XP012059182 [A] 1-10 * page 2972, column 1, paragraph I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1542939 | by applicant | US2005269562 | - "Implant isolation of ZnO", KUCHEYEV SO ET AL., JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, (20030301), vol. 93, pages 2972 - 2976 |