EP2173883 - MSCA1 NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCES IMPACTING PLANT MALE FERTILITY AND METHOD OF USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2017 [2017/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIONEER HI-BRED INTERNATIONAL, INC. 7100 N.W. 62nd Avenue Johnston, IA 50131-1014 / US | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [2016/35] |
Former [2010/15] | For all designated states Pioneer Hi-Bred International Inc. 7100 N.W. 62nd Avenue Johnston, IA 50131-1014 / US | ||
For all designated states E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALBERTSEN, Marc C. Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. 7250 NW 62nd Avenue PO Box 552 Johnston, IA 50131-0552 / US | 02 /
FOX, Tim W. 4518 Ovid Avenue Des Moines, Iowa 50310 / US | 03 /
TRIMNELL, Mary 1045 68th Street, Unit 8 West Des Moines, Iowa 50266 / US | 04 /
WU, Yongzhong 9116 Telford Circle Johnston, Iowa 50131 / US | 05 /
LOWE, Keith 6407 Harbor Oaks Drive Johnston, Iowa 50131 / US | 06 /
LI, Bailin 549 Stenning Drive Hockessin, Delaware 19707 / US | 07 /
FALLER, Marianna 2214 E. Huntington Drive Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/25] | 01 /
ALBERTSEN, Marc C. Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. 7250 NW 62nd Avenue PO Box 552 Johnston, IA 50131-0552 / US | ||
02 /
FOX, Tim W. 4518 Ovid Avenue Des Moines, Iowa 50310 / US | |||
03 /
TRIMNELL, Mary 1045 68th Street, Unit 8 West Des Moines, Iowa 50266 / US | |||
04 /
WU, Yongzhong 9116 Telford Circle Johnston, Iowa 50131 / US | |||
05 /
LOWE, Keith 6407 Harbor Oaks Drive Johnston, Iowa 50131 / US | |||
06 /
LI, Bailin 549 Stenning Drive Hockessin, Delaware 19707 / US | |||
07 /
FALLER, Marianna 2214 E. Huntington Drive Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | |||
Former [2010/15] | 01 /
ALBERTSEN, Marc C. 1930 South 60th Street West Des Moines, Iowa 50266 / US | ||
02 /
FOX, Tim W. 4518 Ovid Avenue Des Moines, Iowa 50310 / US | |||
03 /
TRIMNELL, Mary 1045 68th Street, Unit 8 West Des Moines, Iowa 50266 / US | |||
04 /
WU, Yongzhong 9116 Telford Circle Johnston, Iowa 50131 / US | |||
05 /
LOWE, Keith 6407 Harbor Oaks Drive Johnston, Iowa 50131 / US | |||
06 /
LI, Bailin 549 Stenning Drive Hockessin, Delaware 19707 / US | |||
07 /
FALLER, Marianna 2214 E. Huntington Drive Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US | Representative(s) | Bentham, Andrew J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | Bentham, Andrew J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07813738.7 | 03.08.2007 | [2010/15] | WO2007US75157 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009020458 | Date: | 12.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2173883 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, C12N15/29, C07K14/415, A01H5/00, A01H5/10 | [2010/15] | CPC: |
C12N15/8231 (EP);
C07K14/415 (EP);
C12N15/8289 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/15] | Title | German: | MSCA1-NUKLEOTIDSEQUENZEN MIT AUSWIRKUNG AUF MÄNNLICHE FRUCHTBARKEIT BEI PFLANZEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2016/08] | English: | MSCA1 NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCES IMPACTING PLANT MALE FERTILITY AND METHOD OF USING SAME | [2010/15] | French: | SÉQUENCES DE NUCLÉOTIDES DE MSCA1 AFFECTANT LA FERTILITÉ MÂLE DES PLANTES ET LEUR PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2010/15] |
Former [2010/15] | MSCA1-NUKLEOTIDSEQUENZEN MIT AUSWIRKUNG AUF MÄNNLICHE FRUCHTBARKEIT BEI PFLANZEN UND VERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG DAVON | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/15] | 15.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.12.2015 | 08.12.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/23] | 20.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/23] | Divisional application(s) | EP12168569.7 / EP2631243 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.06.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.11.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 21.11.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.12.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2007002267 (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US]; ALBERTSEN MARC C [US]; FOX TIMOTHY W [US]; H) [Y] 1-16,31,33-68 * abstract; claims 1-65; pages 1-4 and 31-35 *; | [X]WO03008540 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [X] 17-30,32,48 * claims 48 and 68; page 145; Seq. ID Nos. 1602, 5733 and 14975 *; | [A]WO9859061 (PIONEER HI BRED INT [US]) [A] 17-30,32,48 * Abstract; Figures 4 and 5; claims 1-34; *; | [AD]US5689049 (CIGAN ANDREW M [US], et al) [AD] 17-30,32,48 * Abstract; claims 1-5; * | [X] - "Rice abiotic stress responsive polynucleotide SEQ ID NO:1602.", Geneseq, (20050602), Database accession no. ACL27646, URL: EBI, XP002478552 [X] 1-7 * the whole document * | [X] - "Oryza sativa Japonica Group genomic DNA, chromosome 7, BAC clone:OJ1048_C10.", EMBL, (20010531), Database accession no. AP003704, URL: EBI, XP002478553 [X] 1-7 * the whole document * | [X] - ROUHIER NICOLAS ET AL, "Genome-wide analysis of plant glutaredoxin systems", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL BOTANY, (2006), vol. 57, no. 8, ISSN 0022-0957, pages 1685 - 1696, XP002478546 [X] 1-7 * abstract; pages 1686-1688; Figures 2 and 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jxb/erl001 | [X] - "Glutaredoxin-C9.", UniProt, (20031001), Database accession no. Q7XIZ1, URL: EBI, XP002478554 [X] 1-7 * the whole document * | [X] - "Zea mays chromosome 7 clone ZMMBBb-226D18; ZMMBBb0226D18, *** SEQUENCING IN PROGRESS ***, 13 unordered pieces.", EMBL, (20061222), Database accession no. AC195322, URL: EBI, XP002478555 [X] 1-7 * the whole document * | [DY] - WEST, D.P. AND ALBERTSEN, M. C., "Three new male-sterile genes", MAIZE GENETICS COOPERATION NEWSLETTER, vol. 59, (1985), page 87, URL: http://www.maizegdb.org/mnl/59/128west.html, (20080428), XP002478547 [DY] 1-16,31,33-68 * the whole document * | [DY] - TRIMNELL, M. R. ET AL., "New male-sterile mutant allele of Ms22", MAIZE GENETICS COOPERATION NEWSLETTER, vol. 75, (2001), page 31, URL: http://www.maizegdb.org/mnl/75/63trimnell.html, (20080428), XP002478548 [DY] 1-16,31,33-68 * the whole document * | [DY] - CHAUBAL RAJ ET AL, "The transformation of anthers in the msca1 mutant of maize.", PLANTA (BERLIN), (20021113), vol. 216, no. 5, ISSN 0032-0935, pages 778 - 788, XP002478549 [DY] 1-16,31,33-68 * abstract; page 779 * | [Y] - BORTIRI ET AL, "Advances in maize genomics: the emergence of positional cloning", CURRENT OPINION IN PLANT BIOLOGY, QUADRANT SUBSCRIPTION SERVICES, GB, (20060202), vol. 9, no. 2, ISSN 1369-5266, pages 164 - 171, XP005306208 [Y] 1-16,31,33-68 * page 164 - page 167 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pbi.2006.01.006 | [Y] - HESSEL, D AND LAUTER, N., "Dual testcross QTL analysis: a solution to the current rate-limiting steps of positionally cloning QTL in maize", 49TH ANNUAL MAIZE GENETICS CONFERENCE, St. Charles, Illinois, 22.-25.03.2007, (2007), page 130, URL: http://shrimp1.gdcb.iastate.edu/mmdocs/2007Program.pdf, (20080428), XP002478550 [Y] 1-16,31,33-68 * the whole document * | [Y] - WILLIAMS, M. ET AL., "Map-based cloning of the nsf1 (nicosulfuron susceptible 1) gene of maize", 48TH ANNUAL MAIZE GENETICS CONFERENCE, Pacific Grove, Canada, 09.-12.03.2006, (2006), URL: http://www.maizegdb.org/cgi-bin/displayrefrecord.cgi?id=974457, (20080428), XP002478551 [Y] 1-16,31,33-68 * the whole document * | [X] - "Rice stress-regulated promoter SEQ ID NO:14975.", Geneseq, (20050602), Database accession no. ACL36412, URL: EBI, XP002494684 [X] 17-30,32,48 * the whole document * | [A] - "OGPAX10TV ZM_0.7_1.5_KB Zea mays genomic clone ZMMBMa0355B20, DNA sequence.", EMBL, (20030517), Database accession no. CC343065, URL: EBI, XP002494685 [A] 17-30,32,48 * the whole document * | [A] - "Zea mays chromosome 7 clone ZMMBBb-226D18; ZMMBBb0226D18, *** SEQUENCING IN PROGRESS ***, 13 unordered pieces.", EMBL, (20061222), Database accession no. AC195322, URL: EBI, XP002494686 [A] 17-30,32,48 * the whole document * | Examination | - TIMOFEJEVA, L. ET AL., "Cystological characterization and allelism testing of anther developmental mutants identified in a screen of maize male sterile lines", GENES, GENOMES, GENETICS, (201302), vol. 3, pages 231 - 249 | by applicant | US5352605 |