EP2049639 - FABRIC ENHANCERS COMPRISING NANO-SIZED LAMELLAR VESICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states The Procter and Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIZAW, Yonas 11990 Greencastle Drive Cincinnati, Ohio 45246 / US | 02 /
NUNES, Raul Victorino 173 Shoemaker Drive Loveland, Ohio 45140 / US | 03 /
QUAN, Ke-Ming 8647 Eagle Ridge Drive West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | 04 /
CORONA, III., Alessandro 9100 Woodcut Court Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | 05 /
LYNCH, Matthew Lawrence 3769 Harvard Acres Mariemont, Ohio 45227 / US | 06 /
WARD, Alice Marie 6618 Kalbfleisch Road Middletown, Ohio 45042 / US | 07 /
DECLERCQ, Marc Johan Ringlaan 77 1853 Strombeek Bever / BE | [2009/17] | Representative(s) | Mather, Peter Geoffrey NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA 100 Temselaan 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | Mather, Peter Geoffrey NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA 100 Temselaan 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 07813905.2 | 08.08.2007 | [2009/17] | WO2007US75494 | Priority number, date | US20060836269P | 08.08.2006 Original published format: US 836269 P | [2009/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008021892 | Date: | 21.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2049639 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/62, C11D3/00, C11D11/00 | [2009/17] | CPC: |
C11D3/0015 (EP,US);
C11D1/62 (EP,US);
C11D11/0094 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FASERVERSTÄRKER MIT NANOSKALIGEN LAMELLENVESIKELN | [2009/17] | English: | FABRIC ENHANCERS COMPRISING NANO-SIZED LAMELLAR VESICLE | [2009/17] | French: | ÉLÉMENTS D'AMÉLIORATION DES TISSUS COMPORTANT DES VÉSICULES LAMELLAIRES DE DIMENSION NANOMÉTRIQUE | [2009/17] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 08.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/24] | 25.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3954634 (MONSON JAMES A, et al) [X] 1-10 * column 7 - column 8; example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0309052 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 4; claim - * * page 16 *; | [A]US5240562 (PHAN DEAN V [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 9, line 4 - line 10; example 2 *; | [X]DE19961939 (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-10 * page 2, line 24 - line 32; claim -; table - * * page 4 - page 5 *; | [DX]US2002001613 (NIEMIEC SUSAN [US], et al) [DX] 1-10 * paragraph [0016]; claim - * * paragraph [0022]; example - *; | [A]US2003139312 (CASWELL DEBRA SUE [CN], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0130]; claim - * * paragraph [0317] - paragraph [0333] *; | [A]US2004014632 (HOWARD JANE [GB], et al) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0110]; example -; claim - *; | [X]EP1396260 (SALVONA LLC [US]) [X] 1-4,9 * paragraph [0028]; claim - * * paragraph [0043]; example - * * paragraph [0090] *; | [DA]US2004204337 (CORONA ALESSANDRO [US], et al) [DA] 1-9 * example -; claim - * | by applicant | US5747443 | US6211140 | US6521589 | US2003060390 |