EP2057548 - METHOD AND APPARATUS TO ENABLE THE COOPERATIVE SIGNALING OF A SHARED BUS INTERRUPT IN A MULTI-RANK MEMORY SUBSYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2009/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOLFORD, Barry Joe 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
SULLIVAN, Jr., James Edward 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2009/20] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/48] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/20] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07813910.2 | 08.08.2007 | [2009/20] | WO2007US75517 | Priority number, date | US20060822279P | 14.08.2006 Original published format: US 822279 P | US20060565034 | 30.11.2006 Original published format: US 565034 | [2009/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008021909 | Date: | 21.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2057548 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2057548 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/16 | [2009/20] | CPC: |
G06F13/1647 (EP,US);
G06F13/16 (KR);
G06F12/0844 (US);
G06F12/00 (KR);
G06F13/24 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR KOOPERATIVE INTERRUPT-SIGNALISIERUNG EINES GEMEINSAM GENUTZTEN BUSSES IN EINEM SPEICHERSUBSYSTEM MIT MEHREREN EBENEN | [2009/20] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS TO ENABLE THE COOPERATIVE SIGNALING OF A SHARED BUS INTERRUPT IN A MULTI-RANK MEMORY SUBSYSTEM | [2009/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR ACTIVER LA SIGNALISATION COOPÉRATIVE D'UNE INTERRUPTION DE BUS PARTAGÉ DANS UN SOUS-SYSTÈME DE MÉMOIRE À RANGÉES MULTIPLES | [2009/20] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 11.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13184859.0 / EP2680154 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.08.2007 | AT | 18.09.2013 | BE | 18.09.2013 | BG | 18.09.2013 | CY | 18.09.2013 | CZ | 18.09.2013 | DK | 18.09.2013 | EE | 18.09.2013 | FI | 18.09.2013 | LT | 18.09.2013 | LV | 18.09.2013 | MC | 18.09.2013 | MT | 18.09.2013 | PL | 18.09.2013 | RO | 18.09.2013 | SE | 18.09.2013 | SI | 18.09.2013 | SK | 18.09.2013 | TR | 18.09.2013 | GR | 19.12.2013 | IS | 18.01.2014 | PT | 20.01.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 08.08.2007 | |
AT | 18.09.2013 | ||
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
BG | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
MT | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
BG | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
MT | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
BG | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
MC | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
DK | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
PT | 20.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 18.09.2013 | |
BE | 18.09.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
PL | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2013 | ||
EE | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
SK | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | BE | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
RO | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | BE | 18.09.2013 | |
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
LV | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
SI | 18.09.2013 | ||
GR | 19.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
FI | 18.09.2013 | ||
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
LT | 18.09.2013 | ||
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | LT | 18.09.2013 | |
SE | 18.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 18.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5860080 (JAMES DAVID V [US], et al); | [A]US2003021137 (JOHNSON BRET [DE], et al); | [A]US2006044860 (KINSLEY THOMAS H [US], et al) |