EP2062376 - ULTRA WIDE BAND STAND-ALONE REPEATER/SELECTOR AND SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] | 06.07.2012 | Change - extension states | published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/22] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, James P. 9428 E. Mendoza Avenue Mesa, Arizona 85212 / US | [2009/22] | Representative(s) | Hutchinson, Glenn Stanley HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/22] | Hutchinson, Glenn Stanley Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green GB-Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07814291.6 | 21.08.2007 | [2009/22] | WO2007US76367 | Priority number, date | US20060469356 | 31.08.2006 Original published format: US 469356 | [2009/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008027749 | Date: | 06.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2062376 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.03.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/04 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
H04W88/04 (EP,US);
H04B1/59 (KR);
H04B7/14 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2009/22] | H04B7/04, H04B7/14, H04L12/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/22] | Title | German: | SELBSTSTÄNDIGER ULTRABREITBAND-REPEATER/SELECTOR UND SYSTEME | [2009/22] | English: | ULTRA WIDE BAND STAND-ALONE REPEATER/SELECTOR AND SYSTEMS | [2009/22] | French: | RÉPÉTEUR/SÉLECTIONNEUR AUTONOME À ULTRALARGE BANDE ET SYSTÈMES | [2009/22] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 28.06.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1473845 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraphs [0016] , [0 18] * * paragraph [0026] *; | [A]WO9844646 (INTEL CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 3, paragraph 6 - page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 6, line 7 - line 9 *; | [YP]EP1764924 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [YP] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] *; | [IP]US2007177653 (BJEREDE BJORN [US]) [IP] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0054] * * figures 4,8 * | [A] - AYADI J ET AL, "Ultra-wideband investigations for low data rate wireless Personal Area Network", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SCIENCES OF ELECTRONIC, TECHNOLOGIESOF INFORMATION ANDTELECOMMUNICATIONS, XX, XX, (20040315), pages 1 - 8, XP002427979 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * Sections 2.2 and 4 * | International search | [X]US7092676 (ABDELGANY MOHYELDEEN FOUAD [US], et al); | [Y]US6531985 (JONES JEFFREY L [US], et al); | [A]US2006105812 (SHIN YOUNG-WOOK [KR]); | [A]US2004204035 (RAGHURAM SHARADA [US], et al); | [A]US4644366 (SCHOLZ FREDERICK J [US]) |