EP2201179 - IMPROVED CANTILEVER SKIDDING SYSTEM ON A DRILLING RIG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Offshore Technology Development 55 Gul Road Singapore 629353 / SG | For all designated states Offshore Innovative Solutions LLC 5177 Richmond Avenue, Suite 1088 Houston, TX 77056 / US | [2010/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THAM, Hoe, Phong Block 4b Boon Tiong Road 12-27 Singapore 165004 / SG | 02 /
FOO, Kok, Seng Block 719 Jurong West Avenue 1 03-56 Singapore 640719 / SG | 03 /
ALFORD, Jacob 1829 Valence Street New Orleans, LA 70115 / US | 04 /
BENNETT, William, T. 3418 Locke Lane Houston, TX 77027 / US | [2010/26] | Representative(s) | Hocking, Adrian Niall, et al Albright IP Limited County House Bayshill Road Cheltenham, Glos. GL50 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | Hocking, Adrian Niall, et al Albright IP Limited Eagle Tower Montpellier Drive Cheltenham GL50 1TA / GB | ||
Former [2011/22] | Hocking, Adrian Niall, et al Albright Patents LLP Eagle Tower Montpellier Drive Cheltenham GL50 1TA / GB | ||
Former [2010/26] | Hocking, Adrian Niall Albright Patents Eagle Tower Montpellier Drive Cheltenham GL50 1TA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07814769.1 | 10.09.2007 | [2010/26] | WO2007US77956 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009035448 | Date: | 19.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2201179 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2201179 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.03.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E02B17/00 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
E21B15/003 (EP,US);
E02B17/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/42] |
Former [2010/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER AUSLEGERGLEITSYSTEM AUF EINER BOHRANLAGE | [2010/26] | English: | IMPROVED CANTILEVER SKIDDING SYSTEM ON A DRILLING RIG | [2010/26] | French: | SYSTÈME AMÉLIORÉ DE DÉRAPAGE EN PORTE-À-FAUX SUR UN APPAREIL DE FORAGE | [2010/26] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 14.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.09.2007 | AT | 14.10.2015 | BE | 14.10.2015 | BG | 14.10.2015 | CY | 14.10.2015 | CZ | 14.10.2015 | DK | 14.10.2015 | EE | 14.10.2015 | ES | 14.10.2015 | FI | 14.10.2015 | IT | 14.10.2015 | LT | 14.10.2015 | LV | 14.10.2015 | MC | 14.10.2015 | NL | 14.10.2015 | PL | 14.10.2015 | PT | 14.10.2015 | RO | 14.10.2015 | SE | 14.10.2015 | SI | 14.10.2015 | SK | 14.10.2015 | TR | 14.10.2015 | GR | 15.01.2016 | IS | 14.02.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 10.09.2007 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PT | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
TR | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 10.09.2007 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
TR | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 10.09.2007 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
BE | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
ES | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 14.10.2015 | |
LT | 14.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB2139267 (RIG DESIGN SERVICES) [X] 1-4,9 * page 1, line 27 - line 75; figures 1,2 * [I] 5-8,10-15; | [XI]GB2166176 (RIG DESIGN SERVICES) [X] 1-4,9 * page 2, line 19 - line 63; figure 1 * [I] 5-8,10-15; | [X]US3921739 (RICH ROBERT N, et al) [X] 1-4,9 * column 6, line 60 - column 8, line 2; figures 6,9 *; | [X]US4269542 (MUELLER SERGIO R C) [X] 1-4,9 * column 2, line 21 - line 44; figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [A]US6932553 (ROODENBURG JOOP [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0071] , [0085]; figure 9 *; | [A]US4065934 (DYSARZ EDWARD DAVID) [A] 1-15 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US3244242 (WOLFF PAUL A) [A] 1-15 * column 8, line 32 - line 67; figures 7-9 * | International search | [X]US7083004 (ROODENBURG JOOP [NL], et al); | [X]US2004151549 (ROODENBURG JOOP [NL], et al) |