EP2179509 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR REDUCED COMPLEXITY DATA PROCESSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agere Systems, Inc. 1110 American Pkwy NE Allentown, PA 18109-9137 / US | [2010/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAN, Weijun 4123 Ravenna Place Longmont CO 80503 / US | 02 /
ZHONG, Hao 2072 Ornellas Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/17] | 01 /
TAN, Weijun 4123 Ravenna Place Longmont CO 80503 / US | ||
02 /
ZHONG, Hao 1517 Woodmeadow Ct. San Jose CA 95131 / US | Representative(s) | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/17] | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 07815025.7 | 28.09.2007 | [2010/17] | WO2007US79949 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009041979 | Date: | 02.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2179509 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/11, G06F11/10 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
H03M13/116 (EP,US);
G06F11/10 (KR);
H03M13/1105 (EP,US);
H03M13/19 (KR);
H03M13/271 (EP,US);
H03M13/2906 (EP,US);
H03M13/6502 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/17] | H03M13/19, G06F11/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/17] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR DATENVERARBEITUNG MIT REDUZIERTER KOMPLEXITÄT | [2010/17] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR REDUCED COMPLEXITY DATA PROCESSING | [2010/17] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR UN TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES À COMPLEXITÉ RÉDUITE | [2010/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2010 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2010 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 15.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA] - JINGBO GAO ET AL, "Rate-Compatible Punctured Low-Density Parity-Check Codes with Bit-Interleaved Coded Modulation", PROCEEDINGS OF 2005 INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON INTELLIGENT SIGNAL PROCESSING AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS, ISPACS 2005, HONG KONG, 13-16 DEC. 2005, (20051213), ISBN 978-0-7803-9266-3, pages 421 - 424, XP010894626 [X] 1-3,10,13,15 * abstract * * page 422 * * figure 1 * [A] 4-9,11,12,14 | [XA] - WEI ZHANG ET AL, "On the application of low complexity iterative decoding schemes to fading channels", PROC. 2003 IEEE MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, MILCOM 2003, BOSTON, MA, USA, OCT. 13 - 16, 2003, (20031013), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7803-8140-7, pages 428 - 433, XP010698345 [X] 1-3,10,13,15 * abstract * * page 429 * * page 431, column l * * figure 1 * [A] 4-9,11,12,14 | [XA] - GHOSH M, "Digital video broadcasting: cable specification", PHILIPS JOURNAL OF RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19960101), vol. 50, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0165-5817(96)81302-7, ISSN 0165-5817, pages 79 - 90, XP004008204 [X] 1,10,15 * page 83, column r * * page 88, column l * * figures 2,3,8 * [A] 2-9,11-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-5817(96)81302-7 | [A] - TONG ZHANG ET AL, "A class of efficient-encoding generalized low-density parity-check codes", PROC. 2001 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP 2001), SALT LAKE CITY, UT, USA, MAY 7 - 11, 2001, (20010507), doi:10.1109/ICASSP.2001.940503, ISBN 978-0-7803-7041-8, pages 2477 - 2480, XP010803278 [A] 1-15 * page 2477, column r - page 2478, column l * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2001.940503 | [A] - SUQUAN DING ET AL, "Combinatorial Construction of Low-Density Parity-Check Codes for Short Block Length and High Rate Applications", PROC. 2006 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, NETWORKING AND MOBILE COMPUTING, WICOM 2006, (20060901), ISBN 978-1-4244-0517-6, pages 1 - 4, XP031074305 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 2 * | International search | [A]US2006020872 (RICHARDSON TOM [US], et al); | [A]US2004098659 (BJERKE BJORN A [US], et al); | [A]WO2006016751 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al); | [A]WO2007091797 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) | by applicant | - TONG ZHANG ET AL., "A Class of Efficient-Encoding Generalized Low-Density Parity-Check Codes", PROC. 2001 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP 2001, (20010507), doi:doi:10.1109/ICASSP.2001.940503, pages 2477 - 2480, XP002300256 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2001.940503 | - SUQUAN DING ET AL., "Combinatorial Construction of Low-Density Parity-Check Codes for Short Block Length and High Rate Applications", PROC. 2006 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, NETWORKING AND MOBILE COMPUTING, WICOM 2006, (20060901), pages 1 - 4, XP031074305 |