EP2030148 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IMPLEMENTING PARKING TRANSACTIONS AND OTHER FINANCIAL TRANSACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2012 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heartland Payment Systems, Inc. 90 Nassau Street Princeton NJ 08542 / US | [2009/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIX, Robert 197 Belknap Street Concord, MA 01742 / US | 02 /
SCHECTER, Mitchell 19 Garvey Road Framingham, MA 01701-3069 / US | [2009/10] | Representative(s) | Hill, Justin John, et al Ipulse (IP) Ltd. Carrington House 126-130 Regent Street London W1B 5SE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | Hill, Justin John, et al IPULSE 9-10 Savile Row London, W1S 3PF / GB | ||
Former [2009/10] | Hill, Justin John, et al McDermott Will & Emery UK LLP 7 Bishopsgate London EC2N 3AR / GB | Application number, filing date | 07815035.6 | 15.05.2007 | [2009/10] | WO2007US68972 | Priority number, date | US20070748384 | 14.05.2007 Original published format: US 748384 | US20060800592P | 16.05.2006 Original published format: US 800592 P | [2009/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007134323 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2030148 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06K5/00 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
G07F17/24 (EP,US);
G06Q20/10 (EP,US);
G06Q20/12 (EP,US);
G06Q20/20 (EP,US);
G06Q20/28 (EP,US);
G06Q20/351 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM IMPLEMENTIEREN VON PARKTRANSAKTIONEN UND ANDEREN FINANZTRANSAKTIONEN | [2009/10] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IMPLEMENTING PARKING TRANSACTIONS AND OTHER FINANCIAL TRANSACTIONS | [2009/10] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DESTINÉS À RÉALISER DES TRANSACTIONS DE STATIONNEMENT ET D'AUTRES TRANSACTIONS FINANCIÈRES | [2009/10] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2008 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 04.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.2009 | 31.05.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AU707690B (MASTERCARD INTERNATIONAL INC) [A] 1-20* page 9 - page 13 *; | [XI]WO2005048145 (STARBUCKS CORP D B A STARBUCKS [US], et al) [X] 1,13,16,18 * page 2, line 17 - line 21 * * page 4 - page 12 * * figures 2A,2B * [I] 2-12,14,15,17,19,20 | International search | [Y]US5721678 (WIDL ANDREAS [DE]); | [X]US6205553 (STOFFEL LAURENT [FR], et al) |