EP2097433 - OLIGONUCLEOTIDE ARRAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Katholieke Universiteit Leuven K.U. Leuven R&D Minderbroedersstraat 8a - bus 5105 3000 Leuven / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | For all designated states Katholieke Universiteit Leuven K.U. Leuven R&D Minderbroedersstraat 8a - bus 5105 3000 Leuven / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERDEWIJN, Piet Olivierstraat 21 B-3111 Wezemaal / BE | 02 /
VAN AERSCHOT, Arthur Goorstraat 29 B-2220 Heist-op-den-Berg / BE | 03 /
ABRAMOV, Mikhail Ijzerenmolenstraat 24 -b513 3001 Heverlee / BE | [2010/01] |
Former [2009/37] | 01 /
HERDEWIJN, Piet Olivierstraat 21 B-3111 Wezemaal / BE | ||
02 /
VAN AERSCHOT, Arthur Goorstraat 29 B-2220 Heist-op-den-Berg / BE | |||
03 /
ABRAMOV, Mikhail Ljzermolenstraat 24 -b513 3001 Heverlee / BE | Representative(s) | Bird, William Edward Bird Goën & Co Wetenschapspark Arenberg Gaston Geenslaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Bird, William Edward Bird Goën & Co. Klein Dalenstraat 42A 3020 Winksele / BE | Application number, filing date | 07815690.8 | 01.10.2007 | [2009/37] | WO2007BE00111 | Priority number, date | GB20060019182 | 29.09.2006 Original published format: GB 0619182 | [2009/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008037036 | Date: | 03.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2097433 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07H19/06, C07H19/16, C07H21/00 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
C07H19/06 (EP,US);
C07H19/16 (EP,US);
C07H21/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OLIGONUKLEOTID-ARRAYS | [2009/37] | English: | OLIGONUCLEOTIDE ARRAYS | [2009/37] | French: | RÉSEAUX D'OLIGONUCLÉOTIDES | [2009/37] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/37] | 08.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/28] | 24.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0184234 (PROLIGO LLC [US]) [Y] 3 * page 4, line 16 - line 26 *; | [XY]WO2005078102 (GENEIN CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,11,12 * page 6, line 10 - page 7, line 12 * * claims 6-9 * * claims 6-9 * [Y] 3,6,7,9,10,13-18; | [E]EP1845166 (BIOSPRING GMBH [DE]) [E] 1,2,4,5,11 * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0102] ** claims 1,4,10,20 *; | [Y] - GRAHAM RAMSAY, "DNA chips: State-of-the art", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 16, pages 40 - 44, XP002951585 [Y] 6,7,9,10,13-18 * page 43 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0198-40 | [Y] - CHRIS HENDRIX ET AL, "1',5'-Anhydrohexitol Oligonucleotides: Hybridisation and Strand Displacement with Oligoribonucleotides, Interaction with RNase H and HIV Reverse Transcriptase", CHEMISTRY EUROPEAN JOURNAL, (1997), vol. 3, pages 1513 - 1520, XP002480038 [Y] 6,7,9,10,15-18 * page 1513 - page 1514 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chem.19970030920 | [DA] - BRIGITTE ALLART ET AL, "D-Altritol Nucleic Acids (ANA): Hybridisation Properties, Stability, and Initial Structural Analysis", CHEMISTRY EUROPEAN JOURNAL, (1999), vol. 5, pages 2424 - 2431, XP002480039 [DA] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-3765(19990802)5:8<2424::AID-CHEM2424>3.0.CO;2-W |