EP2055151 - BI-CHROMATIC ILLUMINATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2009/31] |
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states TIR Technology LP 7700 Riverfront Gate Burnaby, British Columbia V5J 5M4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASHDOWN, Ian 620 Ballantree Road West Vancouver, British Columbia V7S 1W3 / CA | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Bekkers, Joost J.J. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | Bekkers, Joost J.J Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 07815781.5 | 08.08.2007 | [2009/19] | WO2007CA01394 | Priority number, date | US20060822680P | 17.08.2006 Original published format: US 822680 P | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008019481 | Date: | 21.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2055151 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 21.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02, H05B41/36, F21V7/00, F21V5/00 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
H05B45/22 (EP,KR,US);
H05B45/46 (KR);
H05B47/10 (KR);
H05B47/17 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BICHROMATISCHE BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2009/19] | English: | BI-CHROMATIC ILLUMINATION APPARATUS | [2009/19] | French: | APPAREIL D'ÉCLAIRAGE BICHROMATIQUE | [2009/19] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 25.08.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005265023 (SCHOLL ROBERT [DE]); | [A]US2001005319 (OHISHI MASATOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]CA2583355 (TIR SYSTEMS LTD [CA]); | [A]JP2006080334 (HITACHI LIGHTING LTD); | [A]CA2521588 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE]); | [A]US2004009367 (HATWAR TUKARAM K [US]) |