EP2080824 - A PROCESS FOR PRODUCING FIBER OF ULTRA HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLYETHYLENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HU, Panpan Room 803 No. 38 Lane 220 Anshun Road Changning District Shanghai 200051 / CN | For all designated states YOU, Xiulan Room 802 No. 7 Building Lane 660 Dongming Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200000 / CN | For all designated states LIU, Zhaofeng Room 702 No. 5 Building 1688 Kaixuan Road Xuhui District Shanghai 200031 / CN | [2009/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/30] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/30] | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07816520.6 | 09.10.2007 | [2009/30] | WO2007CN02906 | Priority number, date | CN20061118076 | 08.11.2006 Original published format: CN200610118076 | CN20061147424 | 18.12.2006 Original published format: CN200610147424 | CN2007140678 | 15.05.2007 Original published format: CN200710040678 | CN2007143831 | 16.07.2007 Original published format: CN200710043831 | [2009/30] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008055405 | Date: | 15.05.2008 | Language: | ZH | [2008/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2080824 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2080824 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/46, D01D1/02, D01D5/06 | [2010/20] | CPC: |
D01F6/46 (EP,US);
D01D1/02 (EP,US);
D01D5/253 (EP,US);
Y10T428/298 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/30] | D01F6/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FASERN AUS POLYETHYLEN MIT ULTRAHOHEM MOLEKULARGEWICHT | [2009/30] | English: | A PROCESS FOR PRODUCING FIBER OF ULTRA HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLYETHYLENE | [2009/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE FIBRE DE POLYÉTHYLÈNE DE MASSE MOLÉCULAIRE TRÈS ÉLEVÉE | [2009/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2008 | Translation filed | 23.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 17.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.08.2010 | CY | 18.08.2010 | CZ | 18.08.2010 | DK | 18.08.2010 | EE | 18.08.2010 | FI | 18.08.2010 | LT | 18.08.2010 | LV | 18.08.2010 | MT | 18.08.2010 | PL | 18.08.2010 | RO | 18.08.2010 | SE | 18.08.2010 | SI | 18.08.2010 | SK | 18.08.2010 | TR | 18.08.2010 | IE | 09.10.2010 | LU | 09.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | BG | 18.11.2010 | GR | 19.11.2010 | IS | 18.12.2010 | PT | 20.12.2010 | HU | 19.02.2011 | [2013/14] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
TR | 18.08.2010 | ||
IE | 09.10.2010 | ||
IT | 09.10.2010 | ||
LU | 09.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
HU | 19.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
IE | 09.10.2010 | ||
IT | 09.10.2010 | ||
LU | 09.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
HU | 19.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
IE | 09.10.2010 | ||
IT | 09.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
HU | 19.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
MT | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
IE | 09.10.2010 | ||
IT | 09.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
IE | 09.10.2010 | ||
IT | 09.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
IE | 09.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
LT | 18.08.2010 | ||
LV | 18.08.2010 | ||
PL | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
IS | 18.12.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5230854 (IZOD THOMAS P [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO2004053212 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2005066400 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPS6353283B ; | [A]EP0213208 ; | [A]CN1056544 (UNIV CHINA TEXTILE [CN]); | [Y]CN1160093 (CHINESE TEXTILE SCI INST [CN]); | [A]CN1693544 (UNIV DONGHUA [CN]); | [Y] - JIA G. ET AL., "STUKING ON THE ADHESION OF UHMW-PE FIBER", CHINA SYNTHETIC FIBER INDUSTRY, (199512), no. 6, pages 24 - 28, XP008100177 | by applicant | US480136 | US4115492 | GB2042414 | GB2051667 | US4413110 | JPS59232123 | CN85107352 | EP0205960 | EP0213208 | JPS6315838 | EP0255618 | US5039549 | US5294338 | US5695702 | US5755913 | WO0173173 | US6436319 | CN1693544 | EP1746187 | CN19891007905 | CN19951093838 | CN19971001010 | CN19971006768 | CN20031015300 | CN20051049263 |