|
09.04.2015 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Communication concerning corrected entries of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2014 |
Request for printed patent specification received too late |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.04.2014 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.04.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.12.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.2013 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
78 |
|
11.12.2013 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
78 |
|
12.04.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.04.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
82 |
|
12.04.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.04.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
71 |
|
12.04.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.01.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.02.2012 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2012 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.02.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.12.2011 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
109 |
|
16.12.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
82 |
|
16.12.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
16.12.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
90 |
|
16.12.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
80 |
|
16.12.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.2011 |
Extension of time limit refused |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2011 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2011 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
09.02.2011 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
28.12.2009 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.08.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2009 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2009 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.08.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2009 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2009 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.06.2009 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2009 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2009 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.06.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.06.2009 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
15.06.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
15.06.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
15.06.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
82 |
|
15.06.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2009 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2009 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2009 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
95 |
|
02.06.2009 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
02.06.2009 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.04.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2009 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.05.2008 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.05.2008 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.05.2008 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
22.05.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
51 |