15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
20.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
09.10.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
10.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
29.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] |
22.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] |
24.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
10.04.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] |
13.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
06.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] |
30.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
14.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
07.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
31.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
17.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] |
02.05.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |
25.04.2014 |
Change - applicant |
published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] |
11.04.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.04.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.04.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
10.12.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.11.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.04.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.01.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.06.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.02.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.01.2012 |
First examination report |
|
23.12.2011 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
20.12.2011 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
20.12.2011 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
19.12.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.10.2011 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.02.2011 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] |
15.10.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.10.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.06.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] |
26.06.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] |
19.06.2009 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
16.06.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.06.2009 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.04.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.04.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.06.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.05.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|