Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8466191 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2013 | B2 | US2010179189 | 15.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CN02965 | 16.10.2007 | CN200610129421 | 15.11.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5491863B | Global Dossier | 14.05.2014 | B2 | JP2010509377 | 25.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007CN02965 | 16.10.2007 | CN200610129421 | 15.11.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007321636 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CN02965 | 16.10.2007 | CN200610129421 | 15.11.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2083011 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2014 | B1 | EP2083011 | 09.03.2011 | A4 | EP2083011 | 29.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CN02965 | 16.10.2007 | CN200610129421 | 15.11.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0716005 | 13.05.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CN02965 | 16.10.2007 | CN200610129421 | 15.11.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2669357 | 22.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CN02965 | 16.10.2007 | CN200610129421 | 15.11.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2498797T | 25.09.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CN02965 | 16.10.2007 | CN200610129421 | 15.11.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2009005222 | 02.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007CN02965 | 16.10.2007 | CN200610129421 | 15.11.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2473551 | 27.01.2013 | C2 | RU2009121676 | 20.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007CN02965 | 16.10.2007 | CN200610129421 | 15.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008058448 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN200610129421 | 15.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20090086592 | Global Dossier | 13.08.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200610129421 | 15.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101186612B | 03.10.2012 | B | CN101186612 | 28.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200610129421 | 15.11.2006 |